Pace v. Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Pace, D.V.M
Defendant: Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C., Michael Hebert and Samantha Sousa
Case Number: 3:2020cv00279
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 ***Answer to Amended Complaint due date updated for Michael Hebert answer due 5/12/2020; Samantha Sousa answer due 5/12/2020; Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C. answer due 5/12/2020. (mgh)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Hebert, Samantha Sousa, Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C. filed by Kaitlin Pace, DVM.(Willemin, Michael)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #10 is GRANTED. Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 4/28/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/7/2020. (jdp )
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 Letter Motion from Edward G. Melvin II for Michael Hebert, Samantha Sousa, Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C. requesting Extension to answer submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Melvin, Edward)
March 31, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Michael Hebert answer due 4/10/2020; Samantha Sousa answer due 4/8/2020; Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C. answer due 4/8/2020. (mgh)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on Michael Hebert served on 1 on March 20, 2020, filed by Kaitlin Pace, DVM. (Willemin, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on Samantha Sousa served on 1 on March 18, 2020, filed by Kaitlin Pace, DVM. (Willemin, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C. served on 1 on March 18, 2020, filed by Kaitlin Pace, DVM. (Willemin, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Wilkinson on behalf of Michael Hebert, Samantha Sousa, Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C. (Wilkinson, Benjamin) Modified on 3/31/2020 (mgh).
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Melvin on behalf of All Defendants (Melvin, Edward) Refiled at Dkt #6 . Modified on 3/31/2020 (mgh).
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Melvin on behalf of All Defendants (Melvin, Edward)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/17/2020 02:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/10/2020. NOTE: Judge Lovric ONLY DOES RULE 16 INITIAL CONFERENCES IN PERSON in Binghamton, New York in all cases and no exceptions. Requests to appear by way of telephone conference at the rule 16 initial conference will be DENIED.(Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michael Hebert, Samantha Sousa, Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as t o Michael Hebert, #2 Summons Issued as to Samantha Sousa)(mgh)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Hebert, Samantha Sousa, Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5058298) filed by Kaitlin Pace, D.V.M. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pace v. Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town and Country Veterinary Clinic P.C.
Represented By: Edward G. Melvin
Represented By: Benjamin M. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hebert
Represented By: Edward G. Melvin
Represented By: Benjamin M. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Sousa
Represented By: Edward G. Melvin
Represented By: Benjamin M. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Pace, D.V.M
Represented By: Taylor Crabill
Represented By: Michael J. Willemin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?