Donato v. Saul
Plaintiff: Gina Marie Donato
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00799
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel Stice Tarabelli appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 10/21/2020. (Tarabelli, Daniel)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court has considered Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in this matter under 28 USC 1915. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 7/21/2020. (mab)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. (mgh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Gina Marie Donato advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (mgh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gina Marie Donato. (mgh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (mgh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-SSA Notice of Unfavorable Decision, #2 Exhibit(s) B- SSA Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donato v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Daniel Stice Tarabelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Marie Donato
Represented By: Elizabeth V. Krupar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?