Young America's Foundation et al v. Stenger et al
Plaintiff: Young America's Foundation, Binghamton University College Republicans and Jon Lizak
Defendant: College Progressives, Student Association of Binghamton University, John Pelletier, Brian Rose, Progressive Leaders of Tomorrow ("PLOT") and Harvey Stenger
Case Number: 3:2020cv00822
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT via Letter to Magistrate Judge Lovric from Andrew Hruska dated 9/18/2020 re service upon defendant PLOT by Binghamton University College Republicans, Jon Lizak, Young America's Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email to PLOT dated 9/16/20, #2 Exhibit B - Facebook read receipt, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service for PLOT upon Aviva Friedman, #4 Exhibit D - A. Friedman Facebook post, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service for PLOT upon Masai Andrews, #6 Exhibit F - Emaiil to Masai Andrews business address, #7 Exhibit G - Press Connects article 9/21/19, #8 Exhibit H - Roderick Douglas Facebook Page, #9 Exhibit I - Roderick Douglas Twitter Page, #10 Exhibit J - PLOT Press Release on Roderick Douglas Facebook page, #11 Exhibit K - Request to donate to PLOT causes on Facebook, #12 Exhibit L - Roderick Douglas Facebook Post that he was arrested, #13 Exhibit M - Newspaper article reporting Masai Andrew's arrest 9/4/20, #14 Exhibit N - Roderick Douglas Facebook post re 9/4/20 arrest)(Hruska, Andrew)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25 etc. served on Progressive Leaders of Tomorrow (PLOT) by serving Masai Andrews on 9/14/2020, filed by Binghamton University College Republicans, Jon Lizak, Young America's Foundation. (Zales, Joseph)
September 15, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Progressive Leaders of Tomorrow ("PLOT") answer due 9/28/2020. (hmr)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT re #18 Answer to Complaint by Student Association of Binghamton University. (Saitta, Thomas)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Student Association of Binghamton University.(Saitta, Thomas)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25 etc. served on Progressives Leaders of Tomorrow (PLOT) by serving Aviva Friedman on 9/5/2020, filed by Binghamton University College Republicans, Jon Lizak, Young America's Foundation. (Zales, Joseph)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #15 is GRANTED. Defendants Harvey Stenger, Brian Rose, and John Pelletier shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 10/16/2020. On or before 9/18/2020, Plaintiffs shall file a status report regarding the status of effectuating service on Defendant Progressive Leaders of Tomorrow ("PLOT"). All other schedules and deadlines remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/11/2020. (jdp )
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 Letter Motion from John F. Moore, AAG for John Pelletier, Brian Rose, Harvey Stenger requesting extension of time to respond to Complaint submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Moore, John)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Moore on behalf of John Pelletier, Brian Rose, Harvey Stenger (Moore, John)
September 10, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for John Pelletier answer due 9/11/2020; Brian Rose answer due 9/11/2020; Harvey Stenger answer due 9/11/2020. (hmr)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Binghamton University College Republicans, Jon Lizak, Young America's Foundation dated 9/8/20 by Steven L. Miller regarding service of the Summons, Complaint, General Order 25, etc. upon STUDENT ASSOCIATION OF BINGHAMTON UNIVERSITY and COLLEGE PROGRESSIVES via certified mail on consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Jacob Eckhaus dated 8/27/20 consenting to service via certified mail as to Student Association of Binghamton and College Progressives, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Mail Receipt No. 70150640000272975924, #3 Exhibit C - USPS Tracking Confirmation for No. 70150640000272975924)(Zales, Joseph)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25 etc. served on JOHN PELLETIER, Chief of SUNY-Binghamton UPD on 8/21/2020, filed by Binghamton University College Republicans, Jon Lizak, Young America's Foundation. (Zales, Joseph)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25 etc. served on BRIAN ROSE, Vice President for Student Affairs of SUNY-Binghamton on 8/21/2020, filed by Binghamton University College Republicans, Jon Lizak, Young America's Foundation. (Zales, Joseph)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25 etc. served on HARVEY STENGER, President of SUNY-Binghamton on 8/21/2020, filed by Binghamton University College Republicans, Jon Lizak, Young America's Foundation. (Zales, Joseph)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyson Charles Langhofer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Langhofer, Tyson)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/4/2020. (jdp )
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyson Langhofer Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5188042. filed by Binghamton University College Republicans, Jon Lizak, Young America's Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment, #2 Affidavit of Jonathan Scruggs, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 Attorney E-filing Registration Form, #5 Oath on Admission, #6 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Scruggs, Jonathan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Binghamton University College Republicans.(hmr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Young America's Foundation. (hmr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Tyson C. Langhofer, Email address is tlanghofer@ADFlegal.org. Phone number is 480-444-0020. Admissions due by 8/5/2020. [A copy of this notice was emailed to Attorney Langhofer on 7/22/2020.](hmr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/14/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to College Progressives, John Pelletier, Progressive Leaders of Tomorrow ("PLOT"), Brian Rose, Harvey Stenger, Student Association of Binghamton University. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Brian Rose, #2 Summons Issued for John Pelletier, #3 Summons Issued for College Progressives, #4 Summons Issued for Progressive Leaders of Tomorrow ("PLOT"), #5 Summons Issued for Student Association of Binghamton University)(hmr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, Monetary and Punitive Damages, and Attorneys' Fees and Costs with Jury Demand against College Progressives, John Pelletier, Progressive Leaders of Tomorrow ("PLOT"), Brian Rose, Harvey Stenger, Student Association of Binghamton University (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5180936) filed by Jon Lizak, Binghamton University College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young America's Foundation et al v. Stenger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College Progressives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Student Association of Binghamton University
Represented By: Thomas A. Saitta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pelletier
Represented By: John F. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Rose
Represented By: John F. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Leaders of Tomorrow ("PLOT")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Stenger
Represented By: John F. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Young America's Foundation
Represented By: Joseph Zales
Represented By: Andrew Hruska
Represented By: Tyson Charles Langhofer
Represented By: Jonathan A. Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Binghamton University College Republicans
Represented By: Joseph Zales
Represented By: Andrew Hruska
Represented By: Tyson Charles Langhofer
Represented By: Jonathan A. Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Lizak
Represented By: Joseph Zales
Represented By: Andrew Hruska
Represented By: Tyson Charles Langhofer
Represented By: Jonathan A. Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?