Viera v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Joanne Viera
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and Heather C. Rogers, Esq.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00898
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for Heather C. Rogers, Esq. answer due 10/13/2020. (pjh, )
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for the Amended Complaint served on Heather C. Rogers on 9/21/2020, filed by Joanne Viera, Pro Se. (pjh, )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Heather C. Rogers, Esq. (pjh, )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Heather C. Rogers, Esq. and Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC filed by Joanne Viera, Pro Se.(pjh, )
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued. Served upon Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail. (map)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/12/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. {Copy sent to Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail} (pjh, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with exhibits against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number SYR057902) filed by Joanne Viera, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viera v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather C. Rogers, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Viera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?