Kennebrew v. CR Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Kennebrew
Defendant: CR Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, McKesson Corporation and Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Consolidated Plaintiff: Britney Rawlings, Phyllis Bennett and Darcy Duncan
Case Number: 3:2020cv00947
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Binghamton Office
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc Letter to Clerk of the Court re docketing materials from ND Texas (Quinn, Vivian)
October 12, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Fornadel, III on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fornadel, Joseph)
October 12, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Fornadel, III on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fornadel, Joseph)
October 12, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Fornadel, III on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fornadel, Joseph)
October 12, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Fornadel, III on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fornadel, Joseph)
October 12, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Rogers on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, James)
October 12, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Rogers on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, James)
October 12, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Rogers on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, James)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to, no later than 10/19/2020, review the N.D.N.Y. docket in this case and confer with the Clerk's office to make certain that all documents, pleadings, court orders, court decisions, and other pertinent filings from the Northern District of Texas are properly docketed, included, or referenced on the N.D.N.Y. docket. It is the responsibility of the parties to ensure that pertinent docket entries from the Northern District of Texas have been transferred to the N.D.N.Y. docket. The parties shall notify the Clerk of the Court if any additional docket entries from the Northern District of Texas need to be added to this docket or referenced in this docket. The parties are directed to complete this no later than 10/19/2020. No later than 10/19/2020, all parties are directed to either file a Notice of Appearance or advise the Court in writing that he/she is proceeding pro se. All other schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/5/2020. (jdp )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #78 is GRANTED. Counsel for Plaintiff Rawlings shall file a notice of appearance by 10/18/2020. All parties shall comply with the G.O. 25 Filing Order #34 and Text Order 77 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/29/2020.(jdp )
September 21, 2020 Filing 78 Letter Motion from Steven S. Schulte for Britney Rawlings requesting an extension of time for local counsel to enter an appearance submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment)(amt)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ORDER: All parties shall comply with the G.O. 25 Filing Order. (Dkt. No. 34.) On or before 11/12/2020, the parties shall file one joint Civil Case Management Plan. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/18/2020.(jdp )
September 17, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #76 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven Schulte. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: Admission fee of $100.00, Declaration of SponsorThe corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven S. Schulte. No fee paid. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Envelope) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. (pjh, )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TEXT ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate the two motions referenced in Defendants' letter-brief of 09/14/2020 (Dkt. No. #74 , referencing Dkt. Nos. #2 , #8 ) for the reasons stated therein. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/15/2020. (sal )
September 14, 2020 Filing 74 LETTER BRIEF regarding Status of Motions to Dismiss (for Kennebrew case) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. (Rogers, James)
September 14, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Rogers on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc (Rogers, James)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/11/2020. (jdp, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/11/2020. (jdp, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/11/2020. (jdp, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/11/2020. (jdp)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/11/2020. (jdp, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/11/2020. (jdp, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER approving #61 Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff Darcy Duncan's claims against Defendant McKesson Corporation without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/9/2020. (sal )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER approving #60 Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff Phyllis Bennett's claims against Defendant McKesson Corporation without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/9/2020. (sal)
September 9, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph E. Fornadel III (Bennett Matter) Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5235499. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission, #3 New Attorney E-filing Registration, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment, #6 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James F. Rogers (Bennett Matter) Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5235474. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission, #3 New Attorney E-filing Registration, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment, #6 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph E. Fornadel III (Rawlings Matter) Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5235397. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission, #3 New Attorney E-filing Registration, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment, #6 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 61 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Amended) on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation Only (Duncan Matter) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation submitted to Judge Glen T. Suddaby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 60 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Amended) on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation Only (Bennett Matter) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation submitted to Judge Glen T. Suddaby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James F. Rogers (Rawlings Matter) Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5235316. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission, #3 New Attorney E-filing Registration, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment, #6 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph E. Fornadel III (Duncan Matter) Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5235202. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission, #3 New Attorney E-filing Registration, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment, #6 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James R. Rogers (Duncan Matter) Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5235173. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission, #3 New Attorney E-filing Registration, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment, #6 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER approving #54 Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff Britney Rawlings' claims against Defendant McKesson Corporation without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/9/2020. (sal)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER approving #35 Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff Kimberly Kennebrew's claims against Defendant McKesson Corporation without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/9/2020. (sal)
September 9, 2020 Filing 54 STIPULATION of Dismissal on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation Only (Rawlings Matter) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation submitted to Judge Glen T. Suddaby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 53 STIPULATION of Dismissal on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation Only (Duncan Matter) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation submitted to Judge Glen T. Suddaby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation Only (Bennett Matter) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation submitted to Judge Glen T. Suddaby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's order deeming Rawlings v. CR Bard Inc., et al., Civil Action No. 6:20-CV-1038 (GTS/ML), Duncan v. CR Bard, Inc., 5:20-CV-1045 (GTS/ML), and Bennett v. CR Bard, Inc., 3:20-CV-1047 (GTS/ML), related to this case pursuant to Section G.2. of General Order 12, this case shall be deemed the "Lead Case" and all future filings must be filed in this action only. The Court will conduct a Rule 16 initial conference on 11/19/2020 at 10 a.m., by telephone conference. The parties are directed to call 877-336-1839, and enter access code 5177238. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lorvic on 9/9/2020.(jdp )
September 9, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarpello, Tracey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarpello, Tracey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarpello, Tracey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 9, 2020 Docket Annotation: Per the Court's 44 Order the cases are now consolidated. This is the lead case and all docketing shall be done in the lead case. (jdp)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's order deeming Rawlings v. CR Bard Inc., et al., Civil Action No. 6:20-CV-1038 (GTS/ML), Duncan v. CR Bard, Inc., 5:20-CV-1045 (GTS/ML), and Bennett v. CR Bard, Inc., 3:20-CV-1047 (GTS/ML), related to this case pursuant to Section G.2. of General Order 12, this case shall be deemed the "Lead Case" and all future filings must be filed in this action only. The Court will conduct a Rule 16 initial conference on 11/9/2020 at 10 a.m., by telephone conference. The parties are directed to call 877-336-1839, and enter access code 5177238. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lorvic on 9/9/2020.(jdp )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER: Motions [36, 42] are DENIED, without prejudice. Plaintiff has not appeared in this case and no notice of appearance has been filed on behalf of Plaintiff. The parties may re-new their joint motion after Plaintiff files an appearances with the Clerk of the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/8/2020.(jdp )
September 8, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Stay re #36 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines Exhibit A to Joint Motion to Stay Discovery (Proposed Order) filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/8/2020. (jdp, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 40 Supplemental Admission documents re: #37 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/4/2020. (jdp, )
September 4, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #37 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James F. Rogers. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a completed E-filing Attorney Registration Form and a completed Petition for Admission to Practice; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph E. Fornadel III Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5230544. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission, #3 New Attorney E-filing Registration, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment, #6 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James F. Rogers Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5230493. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission, #3 New Attorney E-filing Registration, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment, #6 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant McKesson Corporation Only by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation submitted to Judge Glen T. Suddaby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 3, 2020 Filing 34 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/12/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER directing Defendants to, within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Text Order, file letter-briefs advising the Court if their respective motions to dismiss still survive and, if so, to what extent and why. In addition, within that same FOURTEEN (14) DAY period, Plaintiff is directed to either have her counsel file a Notice of Appearance or advise the Court in writing that she is proceeding pro se. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/31/2020. (Served Plaintiff's counsel via e-mail). (sal )
August 27, 2020 Filing 32 Letter advising that attorneys Melissa Dorman Matthews, Esq., Jessica Junek, Esq., and Jordan Jarreau, Esq., will not be seeking admission in NYND and will not be representing defendants in this case. (plp)
August 27, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarpello, Tracey)
August 27, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICES of Admission Requirement: Eric Martin Przybysz, Esq. (ericp@fnlawfirm.com), Darren McDowell, Esq. (dmcdowell@fnlaw.com), Steven Scott Schulte, Esq. (schulte@fnlawfirm.com), 214-890-0711 for Plaintiff; Melissa Dorman Matthews, Esq. (mmatthews@hartlinebarger.com), Jessica Junek, Esq. (jjunek@hartlinebarger.com), Jordan E. Jarreau, Esq. (jjarreau@hartlinebarger.com), 214-369-2100. Admissions due by 9/2/2020. (plp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02213. electronically transferred when case opened
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiff' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Johnetta Ateman case be severed and transferred to the Peoria Division of the Central District of Illinois (Civil case 3:20-cv-2209-S opened); b. Plaintiff Ronald Girardin case be severed and transferred to the Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2210-S opened); c. Plaintiff Kyla Ferguson's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2211-S opened); d. Plaintiff Shirley Hasselle's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil case 3:20-cv-2212-S opened);e. Plaintiff Kimberly Kennebrew's case be severed and transferred to the Binghamton Division of the Northern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2213-S opened);f. Plaintiff Angie Lewis's case be severed and transferred to the Savannah of the Southern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2214-S opened);g. Plaintiff Carl Martin's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2215-S opened);h. Plaintiff Harry Stoner's case be severed and transferred to the Erie Division of the Western District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2216-S opened);i. Plaintiff Steve Urevith's case be severed and transferred to the Southern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2217-S opened); (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #24 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith re #24 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 24 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Inc, Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Johnetta Ateman, Alex Dominguez, Kyla Ferguson, Ronald Girardin, Shirley Hasselle, Kimberly Kennebrew, Angie Lewis, Carl Martin, Harry Stoner, Steve Urevith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction as Amended (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CR Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer, for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/9/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by CR Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10897065) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portions of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Depositio, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Inc, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 Citation Issued to McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 Executed Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 Return of Service C.R. Bard, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 Return of Service Bard Peripheral Vascular) (Junek, Jessica) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennebrew v. CR Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Kennebrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Inc
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Represented By: Joseph E Fornadel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Represented By: Joseph E Fornadel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Britney Rawlings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Phyllis Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Darcy Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?