Bower v. Coloplast Corp.
Plaintiff: Patricia Bower
Defendant: Coloplast Corp.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01455
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 2/17/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 8/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/20/2021. (jdp )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 13-15. Preferred Trial Location: Binghamton. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2021. Discovery due by 11/11/2021. Motions to be filed by 12/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/20/2021. (jdp )
January 20, 2021 Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: On or before 4/2/2021, the parties shall file a status report regarding the progress of the litigation. A telephone conference is scheduled for 4/9/2021 at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Jude Miroslav Lovric on 1/20/2021. (jdp )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting the Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/21/2021. (jdp )
January 20, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: an initial conference was held on 1/20/2021. Pretrial deadlines were discussed and set. On or before 4/2/2021, the parties shall file a status report regarding the progress of the litigation. A telephone conference is scheduled for 4/9/2021 at 11:00 a.m. Appearances: R. Fredona, Esq., for Plaintiff; and S. Diwan, Esq., for Defendant. (jdp )
January 13, 2021 Filing 25 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Coloplast Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed ESi Protocol, #2 Exhibit B - Agreed Protective Order)(Diwan, Shaila)
December 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Laine Fredona on behalf of Patricia Bower (Fredona, Rebecca)
December 18, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Coloplast Corp..(Diwan, Shaila)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: NEW TELEPHONE CONFERENCING INFORMATION -- the Courts teleconferencing number and access code have been changed. For all scheduled telephone conferences with the Court, the parties are directed to dial 877-402-9753 and enter access code 9983518. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/10/2020. (jdp )
December 7, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Coloplast Corp. answer due 12/18/2020. (khr)
December 4, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coloplast Corp. filed by Patricia Bower.(Burke, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/3/2020. (jdp, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca Fredona Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5336514. filed by Patricia Bower. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Pro Hac Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Burke, Daniel)
December 1, 2020 Filing 18 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/13/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Attorney Fredona served by email} (jmb)
November 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: for Party Plaintiff Patricia Bower, Attorney Rebecca Laine Fredona. Telephone: 312-462-1700. Email: rfredona@molllawgroup.com. Admissions due by 12/9/2020. {Attorney Fredona served by email} (jmb)
November 25, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03597. electronically transferred when case opened
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Plaintiff's request to amend her complaint, and defendants request for a pre-motion conference to submit a motion to dismiss, is reserved for the transferee court. Defendant's time to answer the complaint is extended to 21 days after the date of this Order, or as otherwise directed by the transferee court. Upon transfer of this action, the Clerk of Court shall close this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/16/2020.Case transferred to District of Northern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Taronji, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 Letter in Response to Defendant's Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Patricia Bower (Fredona, Rebecca) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: By 11/13/2020, plaintiff shall file a letter with the Court, not to exceed three pages, setting forth the legal and factual bases upon which plaintiff intends to rely to oppose defendant's proposed motion to dismiss (Doc. No. #13 ). Upon receipt of plaintiff's letter, the Court will determine whether a pre-motion conference is required in this case. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint is extended until 21 days after this Court's order on any motion to dismiss, or until further order of the Court. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/4/2020. (Prather, Lucy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference seeking leave to file a motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3) and (b)(6), Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to complaint or otherwise respond by Coloplast Corp.. (Rahman Diwan, Shaila) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coloplast Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Coloplast A/S for Coloplast Corp.. (Rahman Diwan, Shaila) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaila Rahman Diwan on behalf of Coloplast Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Rahman Diwan, Shaila) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patricia Bower. Coloplast Corp. waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Fredona, Rebecca) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Coloplast Corp. (Almonte, Giselle) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Patricia Bower (Fredona, Rebecca) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
September 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Laine Fredona on behalf of Patricia Bower (notification declined or already on case) (Fredona, Rebecca) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/3/2020. (Ferrara, Alicia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT State of Illinois Letter of Good Standing by Patricia Bower. Related document: #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13230915. filed by Patricia Bower. (Fredona, Rebecca) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The application will be approved upon submission of a certificate of good standing from the state court in each state in which the applicant is a member of the bar. See Local Civil Rule 1.3(c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/19/2020. (Ferrara, Alicia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13230915. by Patricia Bower. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pro hac vice affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of good standing) (Fredona, Rebecca) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Patricia Bower (Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coloplast Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13188317 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Patricia Bower. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Burke, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bower v. Coloplast Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Bower
Represented By: Daniel C. Burke
Represented By: Rebecca Laine Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coloplast Corp.
Represented By: Shaila R. Diwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?