Dundon v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Dundon
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00236
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Dundon. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. waiver sent on 3/15/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Kaliel, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (jel, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party John Dundon; Attorney Jeffery D. Kaliel and Sophia Goren Gold, Email address is jkaliel@kalielpllc.com and sgold@kalielpllc.com. Phone number is (202) 350-4783. Admissions due by 3/16/2021. (Notice of admission requirement was emailed to both Attorney Kaliel and Gold on March 2, 2021.)(jel, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/25/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (General Order 25 emailed to both Attorney Gold and Attorney Kaliel on March 2, 2021.) (jel, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chipolte Mexican Grill, Inc. (jel, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Chipolte Mexican Grill, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5440921) filed by John Dundon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, ) Modified on 3/3/2021 (jel, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dundon v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dundon
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Kaliel
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?