Loftus, PHD v. American College of Veterinary Nutrition (ACVN)
Plaintiff: Dr. John Loftus, PHD
Defendant: American College of Veterinary Nutrition (ACVN)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00268
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on April 12, 2021. (sas)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dr. John Loftus, PHD (Elia, Anthony)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/9/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American College of Veterinary Nutrition (ACVN). (pjh, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American College of Veterinary Nutrition (ACVN) (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5450307) filed by Dr. John Loftus, PHD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loftus, PHD v. American College of Veterinary Nutrition (ACVN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American College of Veterinary Nutrition (ACVN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. John Loftus, PHD
Represented By: Anthony N. Elia, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?