Basso v. Willow Run Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leonard Basso
Defendant: Willow Run Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00811
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Willow Run Foods, Inc. answer due 9/24/2021 for Amended Complaint. (ztc, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Willow Run Foods, Inc. filed by Leonard Basso.(Lease, Adam)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of Motion to Dismiss #7 , the Rule 16 initial conference scheduled for 10/13/2021 before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric via telephone conference and the deadlines for filing of the Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of the Mandatory Disclosures are STAYED without date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/7/2021. (jdp )
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Willow Run Foods, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Willow Run Foods, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Hurd (Gleason, James)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Willow Run Foods, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Hurd Response to Motion due by 9/23/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James S. Gleason, Esq., #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Complaints, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - Determination & Order After Investigation, #4 Memorandum of Law) (Gleason, James)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Willow Run Foods, Inc.. (Gleason, James)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leonard Basso. Willow Run Foods, Inc. waiver sent on 7/19/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Lease, Adam)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Willow Run Foods, Inc. (ztc, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Leonard Basso is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint (Lease, Adam)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 10/13/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/6/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Willow Run Foods, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5588066) filed by Leonard Basso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basso v. Willow Run Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Basso
Represented By: Adam C. Lease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willow Run Foods, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?