Kellogg v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Alice M. Kellogg
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv01147
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Court has considered Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in this matter under 28 USC 1915. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/29/2021. (mab)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rami Vanegas appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 1/24/2022. (Vanegas, Rami)
October 26, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #5 Social Security Consent / Declination Form. A corrected version of this document was filed at former dkt. no. 7. That document has been moved to replace the incorrect document image filed at dkt. no. 5. The former dkt. no. 7 entry has been deleted in it's entirety. (dpk)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Alice M. Kellogg advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Hiller, Kenneth) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/26/2021) (dpk, ).
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 11/10/2021. (dpk)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alice M. Kellogg (dpk)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (dpk)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kellogg v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice M. Kellogg
Represented By: Kenneth R Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Rami Vanegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?