Kost v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: David Kost
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00591
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The request in Stipulation #10 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that, (1) Defendant is directed to respond to the complaint by 8/31/2022, and (2) the Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 8/17/2022 at 1:30 p.m. is RE-SCHEDULED for 9/28/2022 at 1:00 p.m., via telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/21/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/28/2022. (jdp)
July 28, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 8/31/2022. (jdp)
July 27, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION re: Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. (Renner, Deborah)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation. The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer is now due 7/29/2022 Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/30/2022. (jdp )
June 29, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending the Time to Answer, Move or otherwise Respond to the Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. (Renner, Deborah)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer is now due 7/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/7/2022. (jdp )
June 7, 2022 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Set/Reset Answer Deadline filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2022 Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Renner, Deborah)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party David Kost; Attorney Kurt Schrader, Email address is KSchrader@cglawoffices.com. Phone number is 607-584-4266. Admissions due by 6/21/2022. (Copy served via email with a copy of the General Order 25 Filing Order)(ztc, )
June 6, 2022 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 8/17/2022 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/10/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, )
June 6, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney address and phone number contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 6/9/2022 (ztc, )
June 6, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 6/10/2022. (ztc, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court, Broome County. (ztc, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (ztc, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, Broome County, case number EFCA2022000232 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5924977) filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kost v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Deborah H. Renner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?