P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc. v. Admiral Insurance Company
Plaintiff: P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc.
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00864
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #16 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement edited to reflect Corporate Parent. (egr, )
October 11, 2022 Filing 16 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Admiral Insurance Company naming W.R. Berkley Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Sambursky, Neil) Modified on 10/12/2022 (egr, ).
October 11, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Admiral Insurance Company.(Sambursky, Neil)
September 13, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Barnes on behalf of P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc. (Barnes, Matthew)
September 13, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip R. Earnest on behalf of P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc. (Earnest, Phillip)
September 13, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc. regarding the #14 Notice of Appearance NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney email address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 9/16/2022 (egr, )
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stpulation for an extension of time to answer. Answer now due for Admiral Insurance Company answer due 10/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/12/2022. (jdp )
September 9, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer and Proposed Order by Admiral Insurance Company. (Maniatis, George)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/9/2022. (jdp )
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/9/2022. (jdp )
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Phillip R. Earnest Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6018842. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Raiola, Stephen)
August 31, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew R. Barnes Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6018791. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Raiola, Stephen)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Civil Cover Sheet; Complaint with Accompanying Exhibits served on Robin Hutt-Banks on 08/25/2022, filed by P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc.. (Raiola, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc.. (Raiola, Stephen)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc.; Attorney Phillip R. Earnest, Matthew R. Barnes, Email address is pre@pietragallo.com, mrb@pietragallo.com. Phone number is 412-263-4374, 412-263-1842. Admissions due by 9/6/2022. E-mailed to attorneys on 8/22/2022. (egr)
August 22, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/21/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/14/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
August 22, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Admiral Insurance Company. (egr)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Admiral Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6006572) filed by P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc. v. Admiral Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.W. Campbell Contracting Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F. Raiola
Represented By: Phillip R. Earnest
Represented By: Matthew R. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: George L. Maniatis
Represented By: Neil L. Sambursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?