O.H. et al v. National Vision, Inc.
Plaintiff: O.H., M.H. and Jacquiline Hinkle
Defendant: National Vision, Inc. indivially and doing business as America's Best Contacts & Eyeglasses
Case Number: 3:2022cv00930
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 SECOND Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency the supplemental admission document filed on 10/21/2022 does not comply with the requirement of the local rule in that a certificate must be issued by a Court re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph A. Kopacz. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Request for an extension of time to serve initial mandatory disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/3/2022. (jdp )
November 2, 2022 Filing 14 Letter Motion from Aaron Schiffrik for National Vision, Inc. requesting extension of time to serve initial mandatory disclosure submitted to Judge Lovric . (Schiffrik, Aaron)
November 2, 2022 Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Jacquiline Hinkle, M.H., O.H.. (Beatty, Kathleen)
October 26, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Beatty on behalf of Jacquiline Hinkle, M.H., O.H. (Beatty, Kathleen)
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 Supplemental Admission documents re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Delgado, Gamaliel)
October 14, 2022 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph A. Kopacz. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
October 5, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Anthony Kopacz on behalf of Plaintiffs Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6057884. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Delgado, Gamaliel)
September 27, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE re Dkt. #4 Notice of Admission Requirement filed by Kathleen E. Beatty (gmd, )
September 27, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Vision, Inc. re #7 Answer to Complaint (Schiffrik, Aaron)
September 27, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by National Vision, Inc..(Schiffrik, Aaron)
September 9, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Vision, Inc. re #5 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Admission Requirement, (Schiffrik, Aaron)
September 9, 2022 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Vision, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Vision Holdings, Inc. for National Vision, Inc... (Schiffrik, Aaron)
September 9, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for National Vision, Inc. answer due 9/27/2022. (gmd, )
September 9, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the Dkt. #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney William Henry Hython address and email address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 9/13/2022 (gmd, )
September 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Plaintiff's; Attorney Kathleen Beatty, Email address is kbeatty@forthepeople.com. Phone number is 917-344-7032. Admissions due by 9/22/2022. Clerk mailed a copy of notice to counselor 9/8/2022.(gmd, )
September 8, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial R. 16 Conference set for 11/9/2022 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/2/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd, )
September 8, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT and SUMMONS relating to Dkt. #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in NYS Supreme Court: Tompkins County. (gmd, )
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court: Tompkins County, case number EF2022-0410 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6026089) filed by National Vision, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O.H. et al v. National Vision, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.H.
Represented By: Kathleen Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.H.
Represented By: Kathleen Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquiline Hinkle
Represented By: Kathleen Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Vision, Inc. indivially and doing business as America's Best Contacts & Eyeglasses
Represented By: Aaron M. Schiffrik
Represented By: William Henry Hython
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?