Southern Tier Hotel LLC v. AmGuard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Southern Tier Hotel LLC
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv01079
Filed: October 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/7/2022. (jdp )
December 6, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel W. Ballard, Jr. Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6122372. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor PHV, #2 Exhibit(s) New Atty Efiling Registration-PHV, #3 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission PHV, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificates of Good Standing) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Delgado, Javier)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to file status reports by 1/3/2023. The Rule 16 initial conference is continued without date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/30/2022. (copy served via regular mail on attorney D. Ballard, Esq.)(jdp )
November 30, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: a Rule 16 initial conference was held on 11/30/2022. Counsel for Plaintiff is awaiting admission to the NDNY. The initial conference is continued without date. The parties are directed to file status reports by 1/3/2023. Appearances: D. Ballard, Esq, for Plaintiff; S. Peiper, Esq., for Defendant. (copy served via regular mail on attorney D. Ballard, Esq.) (jdp )
November 28, 2022 Filing 8 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Peiper, Steven)
November 14, 2022 NOTICE : The Rule 16 scheduled for November 30, 2022 at 11:00 AM, will be conducted via Teams. The Courtroom Deputy for the Hon. Judge Miroslav Lovric will provide the parties with a Teams link to participate. (jdp )
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmGuard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent WestGuard Insurance Company for AmGuard Insurance Company.. (Peiper, Steven)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by AmGuard Insurance Company.(Peiper, Steven)
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AmGuard Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Peiper, Steven)
October 20, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for AmGuard Insurance Company - Answer due 10/26/2022. (mgh)
October 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Southern Tier Hotel LLC.; Attorney Daniel W. Ballard, Esq., Email address is DBallard@merlinlawgroup.com. Phone number is Tel.: 732-704-4647. Admissions due by 11/2/2022. (Emailed Counsel the Notice of Admission Requirement with a courtesy copy of the General Order 25)(mgh)
October 19, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/30/2022 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/23/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
October 19, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in Tioga County Supreme Court. (mgh)
October 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tioga County Supreme Court, case number 2022-00062663 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6071951) filed by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A- Tioga County Index, #2 Exhibit(s) B- Tioga County Summons & Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Tier Hotel LLC v. AmGuard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Tier Hotel LLC
Represented By: Javier Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven E. Peiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?