Ruffner et al v. Grid One Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Larry Balcolm, Scott Ruffner and Jeremy Nimmo
Defendant: Grid One Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv01097
Filed: September 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Minard Carkner on October 8, 2024, filed by Jeremy Nimmo, Scott Ruffner. (Files, Ryan)
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant's response is now due on or before 11/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/18/2024. (jdc )
October 18, 2024 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Grid One Solutions, LLC submitted to Judge David N. Hurd. (Anthony, William)
October 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William J. Anthony on behalf of Grid One Solutions, LLC (Anthony, William)
October 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Train on behalf of Grid One Solutions, LLC (Train, Erin)
September 11, 2024 TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 110:00AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc)
September 10, 2024 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/11/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (tll)
September 10, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Grid One Solutions, LLC. (tll)
September 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grid One Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6863065) filed by Scott Ruffner, Larry Balcolm, and Jeremy Nimmo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffner et al v. Grid One Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Balcolm
Represented By: Ryan G. Files
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Ruffner
Represented By: Ryan G. Files
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Nimmo
Represented By: Ryan G. Files
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grid One Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Erin Train
Represented By: William J. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?