Lee v. City of Syracuse, et al
Plaintiff: Katherine J. Lee
Defendant: City of Syracuse
Case Number: 5:2003cv01329
Filed: October 31, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Oneida
Presiding Judge: David E. Peebles
Presiding Judge: David N. Hurd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER: Plaintiff is awarded additional attorneys' fees and costs in the total amount of $39,620.54; The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter a supplemental judgment in favor of the plaintiff Katherine J. Lee and against the defendant Cit y of Syracuse in the amount of $39,620.54; Defendant's request to cancel the supersedeas bond issued by the Hanover Insurance Company (BJS-8807125) is GRANTED; and The March 19, 2012, Order is VACATED. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/12/2012. (see)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER: that pltf is awarded attys fees and costs in the sum of $202,951.61; the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of pltf Katherine J. Lee and against the deft City of Syracuse in the sum of $602,951.61 ($400,000.00 compensatory damages plus $202,951.61 atty fees and costs); and dismissing both actions against the deft City of Syracuse Police Department, and the individually and officially named defts. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/16/2010. (see)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM-DECISION & ORDER: that deft Syracuse Police Defts motions for summary judgment are GRANTED for all of pltfs claims, and all claims against the Syracuse Police Dept are DISMISSED; the individual defts motions for summary judgment for pltfs Title VII claims are GRANTED, and pltfs Title VII claims against individual defts are DISMISSED; Deft City of Syracuses motion for summary judgment for pltfs Title VII claims is GRANTED in Part and DENIED in part; The individual defts motions for sum mary judgment for pltfs ADA claims are GRANTED, and pltfs ADA claims against individual defts are DISMISSED; Deft City of Syracuses motion for summary judgment for pltfs ADA claims is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defts motions for summary judg ment for pltfs 1983 claims are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defts motions for summary judgment for pltfs EPA claims are GRANTED, and pltfs EPA claims against all defts are DISMISSED; Defts motions for summary judgment for pltfs NYHRL claims ar e GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defts motions for summary judgment for pltfs breach of contract claims are GRANTED, and pltfs breach of contract claims against all defts are DISMISSED; The Second, Fifth, Sixth, and Eighth causes of action in Su it I and the First Second, Fifth, Sixth, Eighth, and Tenth Causes of Action in Suit II are DISMISSED in their entirety; Both complaints in their entirety are DISMISSED against defts the Syracuse Police Department, Michael Kerwin, Thomas Galvin, John Falge, Mark McArdle, Captain Ronald Pugh, Daniel Boyle, Deputy Chief Hanna, John Kaufman, Dennis Duval, Gary Miguel, Steve Thompson, Michael Rathbun, and Richard Douglas. The following issues remain to be resolved at trial: (1) liability and damages, if any, against the City of Syracuse for pltfs Title VII retaliation claim arising out of conduct after May 24, 2005 (third cause of action in Suit II); (2) liability and damages, if any, against the City of Syracuse for pltfs Title I ADA claim (fou rth cause of action in Suit I); (3) liability and damages, if any, against the City of Syracuse for pltfs 1983 claims arising under the First Amendment (seventh cause of action in Suit I and fourth and ninth causes of action in Suit II); (4) liabilit y and damages, if any, against deft Michael Heenan for pltfs 1983 claims arising under the First Amendment (fourth and ninth causes of action in Suit II); and (5) liability and damages, if any, against deft City of Syracuse and deft Michael Heenan for pltfs NYHRL claims for retaliation (seventh cause of action in Suit II). Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 3/25/2009. (see)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. City of Syracuse, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine J. Lee
Represented By: AJ Bosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Syracuse
Represented By: Joseph Francis Bergh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?