DeSantis v. Seager
Plaintiff: David DeSantis
Defendant: The State of New York and Kimberly Seager
Case Number: 5:2009cv00530
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Oswego
Presiding Judge: George H. Lowe
Presiding Judge: Norman A. Mordue
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT entered in favor of The State of New York and Kimberly Seager, against David DeSantis. {Copy served upon pro se Plaintiff by regular mail} (mae)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT-RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER: It is Recommended that Plaintiff's # 9 Amended Complaint be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). It is Ordered that objections to the R&R are due by 8/11/2009. Failure to timely file objections will preclude appellate review. Case Review Deadline 8/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George H. Lowe on 7/28/2009. {Clerk has served a copy upon pro se Plaintiff by regular mail} (mae)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: Adopting the # 4 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Lowe with the following exception. The Complaint will be Dismissed automatically within 30 days of the date of this Order, unless Plaintiff files a non-f rivolous Amended Complaint that states a claim upon which relief may be granted. If Plaintiff files an Amended Complaint it is Ordered that the file be returned to the Court for further review. It is Further Ordered that Plaintiff's # 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Granted. Signed by Chief Judge Norman A. Mordue on 7/7/2009. {Copy served upon pro se Plaintiff by regular mail} (mae)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT-RECOMMENDATION & ORDER: It is Recommended that the # 1 Complaint filed by David DeSantis be dismissed and that plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of the filing date of any Order adopting this R&R. Further Recommended that if plaintiff does not timely file an amended complaint the Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing this action. It is Further Recommended that upon the filing of an amended complaint, the file be returned to the Court for further review. Failure to o bject to this Report by 6/3/2009 will preclude appellate review. It is ORDERED that the # 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George H. Lowe on 5/19/2009. Case Review Deadline 6/8/2009. {Clerk has served a copy of this Report-Recommendation & Order upon plaintiff by regular mail} (mae)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeSantis v. Seager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David DeSantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Seager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?