Laskowski et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mark R. Laskowski and Richard Hall
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2011cv00340
Filed: March 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Andrew T. Baxter
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - That Liberty's 159 motion seeking permission to file a reply brief is GRANTED and the brief is deemed filed. That Liberty's 145 motion to enforce a settlement is DENIED. That this case is trial ready and the Clerks hall issue a trial scheduling order in due course. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 5/7/2015. (jel, )
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 SUMMARY ORDER - That Liberty Mutual's motions to preclude (Dkt. Nos. 77, 78) are DENIED. That Liberty Mutual's letter motion seeking permission to file a reply (Dkt. No. 88) is GRANTED and the proposed reply declaration and exhibits thereto are deemed FILED. That Liberty Mutual's motion for modification of the pretrial scheduling order and leave to amend the answer (Dkt. No. 85) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/12/2013. (jel, )
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - That Liberty's 48 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. That, upon the resolution of any outstanding discovery matters, this case is deemed trial ready and the court, in due course, shall issue a trial scheduling order. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 6/11/2012. (jel, )
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER that Liberty's 13 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Laskowski and Hall's declaratory judgment; duty of good faith and fair dealing; and N.Y. Gen Bus Law 349 claims are DISMISSED. That Liberty file the appropriate responsive pleadings within the time allotted by the rules. That the parties notify Magistate Judge Baxter in order to schedule further proceedings in accordance with this order. Signed by Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/19/2011. (jel, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laskowski et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark R. Laskowski
Represented By: Dennis J. Artese
Represented By: Finley Harckham
Represented By: Marc T. Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Artese
Represented By: Finley Harckham
Represented By: Marc T. Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?