Doe v. Colgate University et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Colgate University, Colgate University Board of Trustees, Jeffrey Herbst, Suzy M. Nelson, Kimberly Taylor, Marilyn Rugg, Valerie Brogan and Tamala Flack
Case Number: 5:2015cv01069
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E. Kahn
Presiding Judge: David E. Peebles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDERED, that Defendants Motion to Preclude (Dkt. No. 85) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED, that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 67) is GRANTED with respect to each of Plaintiffs causes of action and the case is dismissed; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on October 31, 2017. (sas)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion to proceed under pseudonym: It is hereby ORDERED, that Plaintiffs Motion (Dkt. No. 7) to proceed under pseudonym is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 4/12/2016. (ban)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in this action anonymously, under the pseudonym "John Doe" is DENIED;and within thirty days plaintiff shall file with the court an amended complaint revealing his identity an d substituting his name for that of John Doe; and in the event that the amended complaint is not filed within thirty days, it will be recommended to the assigned district judge that this action be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 9/4/2015. (lah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Colgate University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Andrew Miltenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate University
Represented By: Laura H. Harshbarger
Represented By: Kristen E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate University Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Herbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzy M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Brogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamala Flack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?