Tolliver v. City of Syracuse et al
Plaintiff: Eric Tolliver
Defendant: City of Syracuse, William J. Fitzpatrick, Michael A. Price, Christhopher Dougherty, Victoria M. White and Dona Hamilton
Case Number: 5:2016cv00099
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Onondaga
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMARY ORDER denying Tolliver's 26 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 5/16/2019. (Copy served upon Eric Tolliver via regular mail on 5/16/2019)(see)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMARY ORDER - That Tolliver's motion for relief from a judgment or order (Dkt. No. 14) is DENIED. That, consistent with the Order of the Second Circuit, Tolliver shall notify the Second Circuit within thirty (30) days of the date of this Summary Order that a decision on his motion for reconsideration has been entered. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 3/8/2017. (Copy served via regular)(jel, ) Modified on 3/8/2017 (jel, ).
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - That Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Danck's February 16, 2016 Report and Recommendation (Dkt. No. 8) is ADOPTED in its entirety. That Tolliver's complaint (Dkt. No. 1) is DISMISSED. That the Clerk close this case, in accordance with the Memorandum-Decision and Order issued by Senior District Judge Gary L. Sharpe on August 30, 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/30/2016. (jel, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolliver v. City of Syracuse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Syracuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christhopher Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dona Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?