Garvey v. Wegmans et al
Plaintiff: Shaun Garvey
Defendant: Onondaga County Sheriff Department and Wegmans
Case Number: 5:2018cv00255
Filed: February 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Onondaga
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT executed from Shaun Garvey re #6 Order on Report and Recommendations, #7 Judgment. (khr)
May 7, 2018 Filing 7 JUDGMENT in favor of Onondaga County Sheriff Department, Wegmans against Shaun Garvey. (Copy served via regular and certified mail) (khr)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECISION and ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #5 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED that Plaintiffs complaint (dkt. # 1) is DISMISSED on initial review under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and 1915A; and it is further ORDERED that dismissal of Plaintiffs 1983 claims is WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; and it is further ORDERED that dismissal of Plaintiffs state law negligence and false arrest claims is WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling in state court because the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over these claims. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 5/4/2018. (Copy served via regular and certified mail)(khr)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND REPORT-RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Shaun Garvey, #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Shaun Garvey, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaun Garvey. ORDERED that Plaintiffs IFP Application (Dkt. No. 2) is GRANTED; and it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs complaint (Dkt. No. 1) be DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY on initial review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(3)(2)(B); and it is further RECOMMENDED that dismissal of Plaintiffs 1983 claims be WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; and it is further RECOMMENDED that the Court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state law negligence and false arrest claims; and it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel (Dkt. No. 3) be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 4/30/2018 Case Review Deadline 5/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/12/2018. (Copy served via regular and certified)(khr, )
February 28, 2018 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed. (khr)
February 28, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Shaun Garvey. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (khr)
February 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaun Garvey. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (khr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2018: #1 Proposed Summons) (khr, ).
February 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Onondaga County Sheriff Department, Wegmans filed by Shaun Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garvey v. Wegmans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onondaga County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wegmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?