United States of America v. Crysler

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jeffrey Crysler
Case Number: 5:2018cv00924
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Onondaga
0 Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
1 Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2018 TEXT NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jeffrey Crysler: Response to Motion due by 10/22/2018. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/26/2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2018 on submission of the papers, with no appearances required, before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (see)
September 17, 2018 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jeffrey Crysler Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2018 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 10/1/2018 Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/5/2018. filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adam Katz, #2 Proposed Order/Judgment, #3 Affirmation of Service) (Katz, Adam)
September 11, 2018 8 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: In light of the issuance of #7 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Jeffrey Crysler, the 11/5/2018 Rule 16 Conference and related deadlines are adjourned without new date at this time. The Rule 16 conference will be rescheduled, if necessary, at a future date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/11/2018. (sg )
September 11, 2018 CLERK'S TEXT NOTICE re: #7 Clerk's Entry of Default: Within 30 days from the date of this Notice, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment against Defendant, made returnable before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino, pursuant to the requirements of N.D.N.Y. Local Rules 55.2(b) and 7.1. (sg)
September 10, 2018 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT noted and entered as to Jeffrey Crysler, re: #6 Request for Entry of Default. (see)
September 5, 2018 6 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jeffrey Crysler by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order/Judgment Certificate of Entry of Default, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Katz, Adam)
August 13, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Jeffrey Crysler answer due 8/31/2018. (see)
August 13, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Jeffrey Crysler on August 10, 2018, filed by United States of America. (Katz, Adam)
August 7, 2018 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (see)
August 6, 2018 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/29/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
August 6, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Crysler. (see)
August 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Crysler filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Notice of Default, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Crysler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Crysler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Adam J. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?