City of Syracuse, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Syracuse, New York
Defendant: Specgx, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., John Doe, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Anda, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Walmart, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC., John Does, Rite Aid Corporation of New York, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC., Depomed, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John Doe Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Actavis, Inc., H.D. Smith Wolesale Drug Company, Actavis, PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc. and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv01184
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David E Peebles
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:18-op-46169, filed 10/24/2018. (amt)
October 22, 2018 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Ohio for inclusion into MDL-2804 National Prescription Opiate Litigation. (plp)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #60. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion into MDL-2804 National Prescription Opiate Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Dan A. Polster, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
October 3, 2018 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, John Does, and John Doe Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (see)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/26/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Depomed, Inc., Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC., Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Rite Aid Corporation of New York, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walmart, Inc., and Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Purdue Pharma, Inc., #2 Summons for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #3 Summons for Cephalon, Inc., #4 Summons for Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, #5 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #6 Summons for Johnson & Johnson, #7 Summons for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #8 Summons for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #9 Summons for Janssen Pharmaeutica, Inc., #10 Summons for Depomed, Inc., #11 Summons for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., #12 Summons for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #13 Summons for Endo Generics Holding, Inc., #14 Summons for Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., #15 Summons for Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., #16 Summons for Mallinckrodt PLC, #17 Summons for Mallinckrodt, LLC, #18 Summons for Specgx, LLC, #19 Summons for Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #20 Summons for Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, #21 Summons for Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., #22 Summons for Allergan PLC, #23 Summons for Allergan Finance, LLC, #24 Summons for Watson Laboratories, Inc., #25 Summons for Actavis, LLC, #26 Summons for Actavis Pharma, Inc., #27 Summons for Insys Therapeutics, Inc., #28 Summons for AmeriSourceBergen Drug Corporation, #29 Summons Cardinal Health, Inc., #30 Summons for McKesson Corporation, #31 Summons for H.D. Smith, LLC, #32 Summons for Anda, Inc., #33 Summons Rite Aid Corporation of New York, Inc., #34 Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., #35 Summons for KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., #36 Summons for Walmart, Inc.)(see)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4524103) filed by City of Syracuse, New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Syracuse, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Generics Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wolesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Syracuse, New York
Represented By: Eva Marie Pearlman
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Represented By: John C. Cherundolo
Represented By: Louis T. Brindisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?