CNY Fair Housing, Inc. et al v. Jamesview Apartments, LLC. et al

Plaintiff: Ryan Pitcher and CNY Fair Housing, Inc.
Defendant: Joseph Conti, Jamesview Apartments, LLC., Mary Ann Conti and Paul "Doe"
Case Number: 5:2018cv01321
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
1 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Paul "Doe", Joseph Conti, Mary Ann Conti, and Jamesview Apartments, LLC.: answer due 1/2/2019. (rep)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CNY Fair Housing, Inc.. All Defendants. (Kirchner, Conor)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/4/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (rep)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Paul "Doe", Joseph Conti, Mary Ann Conti, and Jamesview Apartments, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Joseph Conti, #2 Summons Issued as to Mary Ann Conti, #3 Summons Issued as to Paul "Doe")(rep)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: Against Paul "Doe", Joseph Conti, Mary Ann Conti, and Jamesview Apartments, LLC. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4563477), filed by CNY Fair Housing, Inc. and Ryan Pitcher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CNY Fair Housing, Inc. et al v. Jamesview Apartments, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamesview Apartments, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul "Doe"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Pitcher
Represented By: Conor J. Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNY Fair Housing, Inc.
Represented By: Conor J. Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?