Walton v. The Research Foundation for the State University of New York et al
Plaintiff: Amber Walton
Defendant: The Research Foundation for the State University of New York and The State University of New York Upstate Medical University
Case Number: 5:2018cv01428
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amber Walton (f/k/a Amber Hansel) against All Defendants filed by Amber Walton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C)(Vozzo, H.)
January 15, 2019 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Due to a conflict with Magistrate Judge Peebles' schedule, the in person Initial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 9:30 AM is RESCHEDULED for 4/4/2019 10:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/28/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Plaintiff's counsel is directed to advise defendants' counsel of this change once a formal appearance is made in the case. (sal)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/4/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Research Foundation for the State University of New York. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to The State University of New York Upstate Medical University)(meb)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The Research Foundation for the State University of New York, The State University of New York Upstate Medical University (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4587765) filed by Amber Walton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. The Research Foundation for the State University of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Research Foundation for the State University of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State University of New York Upstate Medical University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Walton
Represented By: H. Larry Vozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?