Tilkins v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Tracey Tilkins
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00031
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
1 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed Plaintiff's letter request (Dkt. No. #8 ) to substitute Dkt. No. [8-1] for the exhibit filed at Dkt. No. [1-1]. Letter request granted for the reasons stated by Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to replace Dkt. No. [1-1] with Dkt. No. [8-1], and thereafter release the viewing restriction on Dkt. No. [1-1]. Because a review of the docket shows that service is not yet complete on Defendant, Plaintiff must file appropriate affidavit(s) of service to reflect that Dkt. No. [8-1] was properly served on Defendant. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/7/2019. (sg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Anna B. Robbins for Tracey Tilkins requesting Amend for SF 95 submitted to Judge Dancks . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Robbins, Anna)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER LIFTING STAY: As the Court has been notified by the Department of Justice that appropriations have been restored, the stay of this case is lifted and progression of the case may resume. Relevant deadlines, if any, will be reset by separate text notice. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/30/2019. (sg)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl G. Eurenius on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Eurenius, Carl)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER STAYING CASE AND TOLLING DEADLINES: Due to lack of budget appropriations and pursuant to General Order #48, this case is STAYED until the business day after the President signs into law a budget appropriation that restores Department of Justice funding; and it is further ORDERED that all deadlines, including remaining scheduling order deadlines and seal deadlines in qui tam cases, are tolled for the duration of the Government shutdown and extended thereafter for a period of time equal to the number of days between 12/22/2018 and the date the President signs into law a budget appropriation that restores Department of Justice funding, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Once the Court has been made aware of the restoration of Department of Justice funding the stay will be lifted and relevant deadlines reset. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/16/2019. (sg)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint served on Paula Briggs on 1/14/2019, filed by Tracey Tilkins. (Robbins, Anna)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/22/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (rep)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to the U.S. Attorney General)(rep)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: Against United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4612576), filed by Tracey Tilkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Form 95, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rep) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/8/2019) (sg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tilkins v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Carl G. Eurenius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Tilkins
Represented By: Anna B. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?