Wade v. Empire Foodservice Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mardella Wade
Defendant: Empire Foodservice Group, LLC and Syracuse Foodservice Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00033
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Empire Foodservice Group, LLC, Syracuse Foodservice Group, Inc..(Melvin, Edward)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Letter Request for an extension of time for defendants Empire Foodservice Group, LLC and Syracuse Foodservice Group, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint on or before 2/27/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 2/12/2019. (sal )
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Edward G. Melvin II for Empire Foodservice Group, LLC, Syracuse Foodservice Group, Inc. requesting Extension to answer submitted to Judge David E. Peebles . (Melvin, Edward)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Melvin on behalf of All Defendants (Melvin, Edward)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/2/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Empire Foodservice Group, LLC, Syracuse Foodservice Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfp, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Empire Foodservice Group, LLC, Syracuse Foodservice Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4613059) filed by Mardella Wade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Empire Foodservice Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mardella Wade
Represented By: Justin S. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Foodservice Group, LLC
Represented By: Edward G. Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syracuse Foodservice Group, Inc.
Represented By: Edward G. Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?