Beebe v. Jimico Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Beebe
Defendant: Jimico Enterprises, Inc. and James Dammen
Case Number: 5:2019cv00062
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: approving the #5 Stipulation. The time for defendants James Dammen and Jimico Enterprises, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 3/25/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/25/2019. (nmk)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION and Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint by Danielle Beebe submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Matusz, Stanley)
February 21, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for James Dammen answer due 3/4/2019; Jimico Enterprises, Inc. answer due 3/4/2019. (jdp, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jimico Enterprises, Inc.; James Dammen on 02/11/19, filed by Danielle Beebe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Matusz, Stanley)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/10/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to James Dammen, Jimico Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for James Dammen)(hmr)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against James Dammen, Jimico Enterprises, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4621093) filed by Danielle Beebe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beebe v. Jimico Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimico Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dammen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Beebe
Represented By: Stanley J. Matusz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?