Gibson v. Kenneth Joseph Green, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Laura A. Gibson
Defendant: Kenneth Joseph Green, LLC and Kelly Green
Case Number: 5:2019cv00214
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: In light of the #7 Status Report, the time for defendants Kelly Green and Kenneth Joseph Green, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 4/26/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 4/4/2019. (nmk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Laura A. Gibson. (Morrell, Kimberly)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: On 3/12/2019 and 3/14/2019, plaintiff filed proof of service asserting that the summons and complaint were served upon the defendants on 3/8/2019. The time for defendants to file an answer or otherwise move has expired. Pursuant to Local Rule 55.1, plaintiff may request a clerk's entry of default or, in the alternative, plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 4/5/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 4/1/2019. (nmk)
March 14, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Kenneth Joseph Green, LLC answer due 3/29/2019. (see)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Secretary of State for Kenneth Joseph Green, LLC on March 8, 2019, filed by Laura A. Gibson. (Morrell, Kimberly)
March 12, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Kelly Green answer due 3/28/2019. (see)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Kelly Green on March 8, 2019, filed by Laura A. Gibson. (Morrell, Kimberly)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone, unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/9/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Kelly Green and Kenneth Joseph Green, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Kelly Green)(see)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kelly Green and Kenneth Joseph Green, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4653302) filed by Laura A. Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Kenneth Joseph Green, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura A. Gibson
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Morrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Joseph Green, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?