Burt v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: William J. Burt
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00261
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Approving the #11 Stipulation of Dismissal as to defendant Hill-Rom Company, Inc. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on April 8, 2019. (rep)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Hill-Rom Company, Inc. Without Prejudice by Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc., Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston submitted to Judge Hurd. (Decker, Byrne)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William J. Burt. Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc. served on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Olinsky, Howard)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William J. Burt. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Olinsky, Howard)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER approving #5 Stipulation for an extension of time for defendants Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint on or before 5/6/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 3/27/2019. (sal )
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hill-Rom Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Hill-Rom, Inc., Other Affiliate Advanced Respiratory, Inc. for Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc... (Decker, Byrne)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation, Corporate Parent The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.. (Decker, Byrne)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint and Order Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc., Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston submitted to Judge David N. Hurd. (Decker, Byrne)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Byrne J. Decker on behalf of Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc., Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Decker, Byrne)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 5/24/2019 at 9:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/17/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (rep)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc., and Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to HIll Rom Corporation, Inc.)(rep)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: Against Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc., Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4659078), filed by William J. Burt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burt v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill-Rom Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Burt
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?