Bunce v. Farm Service Agency
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Bunce
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Case Number: 5:2019cv00266
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07:6999
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed Plaintiff's request for summons (Dkt. No. #13 ); however, summons have already been issued. (Dkt. No. #10 .) Service is still ongoing and not yet complete on all required government entities. The Marshals are completing service. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/24/2019. (copy of this text order served on pro se party via regular mail.) (sg)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 Letter request filed by Timothy J. Bunce requesting the Clerk to issue summonses. (jdp, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 285 Form) Executed as to Farm Service Agency served on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (jdp, )
April 8, 2019 USM 285 packet sent to Syracuse Clerk's Office. (jdp, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/1/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (Sent to Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail)(jdp, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Farm Service Agency, US Attorney Office and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jdp, )
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Ordered that Plaintiff's #2 in forma pauperis is granted. The Clerk shall issue a summons and forward it with a copy of the complaint and General Order 25 to the United States Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/5/2019. (Copy served to pro se Plaintiff via regular mail)(jdp, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed Dkt. No. #6 . The Complaint and request for in forma pauperis status are currently under review by the Court pursuant to 28 USC Section 1915. Court will issue a determination in due course at which time, if the case survives initial review, a summons will be issued such that service can be effectuated. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/19/2019. (copy of this text order served on pro se party via regular mail.)(sg)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Larkin on behalf of Farm Service Agency (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Larkin, William)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Letter- copy of Letter sent by United States by Farm Service Agency to pro se Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Larkin, William) Modified on 3/19/2019 (sg, ).
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and sent back signed and dated to the Clerk's office. (jdp, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (Sent to Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail) (jdp, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed. Extra signed copy of notice was included with the mailing as well as a file stamped copy of the first page of the complaint. (jdp, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Timothy J. Bunce. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (jdp, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Farm Service Agency filed by Timothy J. Bunce. (Attachments: #1 Letter cover with Envelope, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunce v. Farm Service Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Represented By: William F. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Bunce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?