McCray v. Dec et al

Plaintiff: Ian McCray
Defendant: Michael Dec and Christine Dec
Case Number: 5:2019cv00651
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Root on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Root, Michael)
July 11, 2019 TEXT NOTICE of Telephone Conference: A Telephone Status Conference has been set for 10/28/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Defendant counsel is directed to initiate the call and to contact Chambers at (315) 234-8618 (the dedicated conference line) once all counsel are on the line. (sg,
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation: Deadline for Mediator Selection is 8/8/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 11/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 7/11/2019. (sg)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures shall be exchanged by 7/18/2019. Rule 33 and 34 Requests to be served by 8/8/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/30/2019. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Discovery motions due 5/7/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/29/2020. Anticipated length of trial: 5 days, trial to be held in Albany NY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 7/11/2019. (sg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Herkala on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Herkala, David)
July 11, 2019 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/11/2019. Appearances: Michael Root, Esq. o/b/o David Herkala, Esq. and Thomas Cerio, Esq. for Plaintiff; Kristin Poling, Esq. for Defendants. Court advises Mr. Root that he must file a notice of appearance if he will continue to appear for conferences in this matter. Plaintiff to provide medical authorizations to Defendants as soon as possible. Court reviews Civil Case Management Plan. Pretrial deadlines are established. A scheduling order and mediation referral order will be issued. (Digitally Recorded)) (sg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Christine Dec, Michael Dec. (Poling, Kristin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin E. Poling on behalf of Christine Dec, Michael Dec (Poling, Kristin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks by telephone. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/5/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (rep)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER: To Complaint, filed by Christine Dec and Michael Dec.(rep)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT: Originally filed by Ian McCray. (rep)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: From New York State Supreme Court; Onondaga County, case number 0040305/2019 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4758550) Removed by Michael Dec and Christine Dec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCray v. Dec et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dec
Represented By: James E. Mercante
Represented By: Kristin E. Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Dec
Represented By: James E. Mercante
Represented By: Kristin E. Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian McCray
Represented By: David W. Herkala
Represented By: Thomas J. Cerio
Represented By: Michael D. Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?