Larsen et al v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Larsen and Sarah Larsen
Defendant: Hess Retail Stores LLC and Speedway LLC
Not Yet Classified: Stephen T. Helmer
Case Number: 5:2019cv00897
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: granting #16 Letter Request. Defendant Speedway LLC's corporate representative is permitted to attend the 12/16/2019 mediation session via telephone. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/6/2019. (nmk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER BRIEF requesting permission for client Speedway LLC be permitted to attend mediation session via telephone by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Stephen T. Helmer, Esq. has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Brittany L. Hannah, Esq. and James L. Alexander, Esq.. Dated: September 3, 2019(Hannah, Brittany)
August 26, 2019 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: A telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/7/2020 at 10:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Defense counsel is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. (nmk)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 10/14/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/16/2019. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/26/2019. (nmk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for the joinder of parties and the amendment of pleadings is 10/31/2019. Discovery cutoff is 7/13/2020 (plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by 4/14/2020; defendant's expert disclosures due by 5/29/2020; and any rebuttal disclosures are due by 6/15/2020). Substantive motions to be filed by 9/16/2020. Anticipated length of trial: 5 days. Preferred Trial Location: Syracuse. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/26/2019. (nmk)
August 26, 2019 TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Rule 16 conference held on 8/26/2019 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: The court explained the Mandatory Mediation Program to counsel. Mandatory disclosures have been exchanged. Pretrial deadlines were established. A scheduling order will be issued on behalf of District Judge Hurd. Counsel may submit a proposed protective order for the court's consideration. A telephonic status conference is set for 1/7/2020 at 10:30 AM. Appearances: James Alexander, Esq. for plaintiffs; Brittany Hannah, Esq. for defendant. Time: 10:01 AM - 10:10 AM. (nmk)
August 22, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Counsel are reminded that a telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before U.S Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. (nmk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER re #6 Notice of Admission Requirement, advising the court that Attorney Kristin L. Walker will not remain as counsel. (khr)
August 1, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #10 Answer to Complaint. Amended TEXT to read Notice of Appearance not Answer. (khr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Larsen.(Alexander, James) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct docket text, document is a Notice of Appearance not an Answer. (khr)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for all documents e-filed in the Northern District to date served on Kristin L. Walker, Esq., of Alexander & Catalano, LLP on July 26, 2019, filed by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Supreme Court Notice of Removal served on Kristin L. Walker, Esq. of Alexander & Catalano, LLP on July 26, 2019, filed by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiffs; Attorney Kristin L. Walker. Phone number is 315-479-8660. Admissions due by 8/8/2019. {Served by email on 7/25/2019}(see)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone, unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/19/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC. (see)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 State Court ANSWER to Complaint by Speedway LLC.(see)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Onondaga County, case number 003416/2019 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4809145) filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of Attached Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) B - State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C - State Court Answer, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief, #5 Exhibit(s) E - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief, #6 Exhibit(s) F - Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance as to defendant Hess Retail Stores LLC only, #7 Exhibit(s) G - Stipulation Amending Caption, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsen et al v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Larsen
Represented By: James L. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Larsen
Represented By: James L. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Retail Stores LLC
Represented By: Brittany Lee Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Brittany Lee Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Stephen T. Helmer
Represented By: Stephen T. Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?