United States of America v. Pickett et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: XYZ Corporation, John Doe, The Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services, Robin Aleata Pickett, Frontier Housing Corporation and Mary Roe
Case Number: 5:2019cv00978
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Robin Aleata Pickett, Frontier Housing corporation, the Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services : Response to Motion due by 10/21/2019. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/28/2019. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on SUBMIT only. No personal appearances are needed.(jel, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Robin Aleata Pickett, Frontier Housing corporation, the Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order/Judgment) (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Text Only Order - On September 9, 2019, a clerk's entry of default was entered against defendants Frontier Housing Corporation, Robin Aleata Pickett and the Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services. (Dkt. No. 7.) Plaintiff is directed to file the appropriate motion or a status report on or before October 9, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/20/2019. (jel, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Frontier Housing Corporation, Robin Aleata Pickett, The Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services (jel, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Frontier Housing Corporation, Robin Aleata Pickett, The Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LaBletta, Nicole)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: On 9/5/2019, plaintiff filed proof of service asserting that the summons and complaint were served upon the defendants Robin Aleata Pickett and The Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services on 8/13/2019. The time for defendants to file an answer or otherwise move has expired. Pursuant to Local Rule 55.1, plaintiff may request a clerk's entry of default or, in the alternative, plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 9/13/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/6/2019. (nmk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Frontier Housing Corporation served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Robin Aleata Pickett served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; The Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole)
August 9, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, Mary Roe and XYZ Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe", "Mary Roe" or "XYZ Corporation" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe", "Mary Roe" and "XYZ Corporation" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summonses will be issued at that time. (hmr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (LaBletta, Nicole)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Frontier Housing Corporation, Robin Aleata Pickett, The Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for the Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services, #2 Summons Issued for Frontier Housing Corporation)(hmr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT- Action to Foreclose a Mortgage against John Doe, Frontier Housing Corporation, Robin Aleata Pickett, Mary Roe, The Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services, XYZ Corporation filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pickett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Commissioner of the Jefferson County Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Aleata Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Housing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole B. LaBletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?