Smith v. City of Syracuse
Plaintiff: Lois Smith
Defendant: City of Syracuse
Case Number: 5:2019cv00997
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Letter Request for an extension of time to respond to the #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Response to Motion due by 10/21/2019; Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/28/2019. Motion will be heard on submission of the papers. Once the motion has been fully briefed, and reviewed, counsel will be notified if oral argument is necessary. SO ORDERED by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 9/23/2019. (rjb, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Request/ Letter Motion from K. Felicia Pitts-Davis for Lois Smith requesting Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Response to Motion to Dismiss submitted to Judge Hon. Brenda K. Sannes . (Davis, K.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set for 9/16/2019 and 9/9/2019 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after disposition of the #6 motion to dismiss. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/10/2019. (nmk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Brenda K. Sannes Response to Motion due by 9/30/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/7/2019. filed by City of Syracuse. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Todd M. Long, Esq., #2 Exhibit(s) A - Notice of Claim (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit(s) B - Amended Complaint in Alexander v. City of Syracuse, et al., #4 Memorandum of Law in support of Defendant's Motion for a Judgment on the Pleadings, with Certificate of Service attached) (Long, Todd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint as attached to Defendant's Notice of Removal at Dkt. No. 1-1 by City of Syracuse.(Long, Todd)
August 13, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for City of Syracuse answer due 8/19/2019. (dpk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Syracuse re #1 Notice of Removal, (Long, Todd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 10:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's Chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/9/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by City of Syracuse. (dpk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Onondaga, case number SU-2019-003850 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4833963) filed by City of Syracuse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Record), #2 Exhibit B (Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. City of Syracuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Syracuse
Represented By: Todd M. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Smith
Represented By: K. Felicia Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?