Zackowski v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Maria D Zackowski
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2019cv01136
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Rogers on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Rogers, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO APPEAR WITHOUT PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OR LOCAL COUNSEL filed by attorney for Plaintiff Maria D. Zackowski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope). Motion referred to Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. (pjh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: granting #14 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James F. Rogers is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/23/2019. (nmk)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James F. Rogers Filing fee $100, receipt number BNYNDC-4877828. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, #2 Petition for Admission to Practice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #9 Notice of Appearance (Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #10 Notice of Appearance (Scarpello, Tracey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Scarpello, Tracey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Quinn, Vivian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Letter of Richard B. North, Jr., dated 9/17/2019 advising he will not representing Defendants in this action. (re #7 Notice of Admission Requirement) (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant; Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Esq., Email address is richard.north@nelsonmullins.com. Phone number is 404-322-6000. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney Rand P. Nolen, Esq., Email address is rand_nolen@fleming-law.com. Phone number is 713-621-7944. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-02216. electronically transferred when case opened
September 10, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Northern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-2216-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 1 *COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13152184 filed by Maria D Zackowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) *Modified to Correct File Date on 8/22/2019 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zackowski v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D Zackowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?