Brown v. Tim Hortons et al
Plaintiff: Jeramiah Brown
Defendant: Tim Hortons and 7-Eleven
Case Number: 5:2019cv01160
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to 7-Eleven, Tim Hortons. (nas, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 BILL OF COSTS submitted by US Marshal re: Service Fees in the amount of $16.00. (nas, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION & ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on November 05, 2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by 7-Eleven, Tim Hortons submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Verone Juliano, Christina)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: In light of the #10 Notice of Settlement, the Rule 16 conference set for 12/11/2019 and 12/4/2019 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. Defense counsel is directed to submit a stipulation of dismissal, on or before 11/20/2019, or, in the alternative, a status report providing an update on the settlement in this case. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/21/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by 7-Eleven, Tim Hortons (Verone Juliano, Christina)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Verone Juliano on behalf of All Defendants (Verone Juliano, Christina)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 11:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/4/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Copy served upon pro se plaintiff by regular mail} (jmb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Tim Hortons. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for 7 Eleven) (jmb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 DECISION & ORDER: It is Ordered that Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, The Clerk shall issue a summons and forward it, along with a copy of the complaint and General Order 26 packet to the United States Marshal for service upon the named defendants. It is further Ordered that the #3 Motion to Seal Case is DENIED and the Clerk is directed to UNSEAL this action, however the Clerk is directed to RESTRICT access to the case to parties and public terminal users. It is further Ordered that the #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED AS PREMATURE and WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL at an appropriate time. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/24/19. {Copy served upon the pro se plaintiff via regular mail) (jmb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained to Jeramiah Brown at time complaint was filed, plaintiff also provided a copy of the NDNY Local Rules. (jmb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Jeramiah Brown, Pro Se. Motion referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (jmb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Case filed by Jeramiah Brown, Pro Se. Motion referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (jmb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Short Form) filed by Jeramiah Brown, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Second Application to Proceed without prepayment of fees, #2 Proposed Summons for Tim Hortons, #3 Proposed Summons for 7-Eleven) Motion referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (jmb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: against Tim Hortons and 7-Eleven, filed by Jeramiah Brown, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Exhibirts, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Tim Hortons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hortons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeramiah Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?