Poppenger v. Mae
Plaintiff: Susan Poppenger
Defendant: Fannie Mae and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 5:2019cv01191
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Letter Request: It is hereby ORDERED that the joint request to adjourn the motion deadline is GRANTED; The Motion filing deadline is extended to 12/30/19; The response deadline is reset for 2/14/20; The reply deadline is reset for 2/28/20; The Return date is reset for March 3, 2020 (ON SUBMIT) before Judge D'Agostino; No personal appearances will be necessary. The motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF THESE DEADLINES WILL BE ENTERTAINED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 11/4/2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(ban)
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 Joint Letter Motion from counsel for Defendant for Fannie Mae requesting Extension of Motion Deadlines submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Mordkoff, David)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Due to the 16 Amended Text Notice issued on 10/16/2019, the IN PERSON Rule 16 Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric in Binghamton is adjourned without date. The deadline for filing a Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of mandatory disclosures is stayed at this time. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/4/2019. (jdp )
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED TEXT NOTICE: During the telephone conference before Judge D'Agostino on October 16, 2019, Judge D'Agostino permitted defense counsel to file a motion to dismiss/motion to lift stay. Defendant's motion shall be filed on or before 11/14/19. The motion shall be made returnable for January 21, 2020 (ON SUBMIT) before Judge D'Agostino; The plaintiff shall file a response on or before 12/30/19. Defendant's reply shall be filed on or before 1/10/20; The motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only. No personal appearances will be necessary. [copy mailed to plaintiff] (ban)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE: During the telephone conference before Judge D'Agostino on October 16, 2019, Judge D'Agostino permitted defense counsel to file a motion to dismiss/motion to lift stay. Defendant's motion shall be filed on or before 11/14/19. The motion shall be made returnable for January 21, 2019 (ON SUBMIT) before Judge D'Agostino; The plaintiff shall file a response on or before 12/30/19. Defendant's reply shall be filed on or before 1/10/19; The motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only. No personal appearances will be necessary. [copy mailed to plaintiff] (ban)
October 16, 2019 TEXT Minute Entry for Telephone Pre-Motion Conference held on 10/16/2019 before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino: Appearances by Susan Poppenger, pro se plaintiff; and David Mordkoff, Esq. for the defendant; Judge D'Agostino addresses the pro se plaintiff and counsel for the defendant; The Court will permit the defendant to file a motion to dismiss/motion to lift stay within 30 days (on or before 11/14/19). A text notice will be filed setting the response and reply deadlines; If the plaintiff retains new counsel, that attorney will be expected to file a notice of appearance and respond to the motion; If the plaintiff does not retain a new attorney, she will be expected to respond to the motion. [copy mailed to plaintiff] (Court Reporter Lisa Tennyson, CRD Britney Norton [Time 10:30 a.m. - 10:45 a.m.]) (ban)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION re #9 Pre-Motion Letter by Fannie Mae requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino, filed by Susan Poppenger Pro Se. With envelope attached. (kmp)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Pre-Motion Letter served on Plaintiff on October 9, 2019, filed by Fannie Mae. (Mordkoff, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 Pre-Motion Letter by Fannie Mae requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 10/15/2019 (Mordkoff, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for all filed papers in this action by David S. Mordkoff served on Plaintiff Susan Poppenger on October 8, 2019, filed by Fannie Mae. (Mordkoff, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Pre-Motion Letter served on Plaintiff on October 2, 2019, filed by Fannie Mae. (Mordkoff, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Letter dated 10/2/19 from Scott Bielicki, Esq. that he will not be representing Plaintiff. Plaintiff is seeking new counsel. With envelope attached. (kmp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Pre-Motion Letter by Fannie Mae requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 10/7/2019 (Mordkoff, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Mordkoff on behalf of Fannie Mae (Mordkoff, David)
September 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION Pursuant to a telephone conversation with the Plaintiff Clerk mailed Pro Se Handbook, Pro Se Notice, Pro Se Assistance Program Pamphlet, Local Rules, and a Motion to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiff. (pjh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Fannie Mae re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Complaint Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Court Summons & Complaint)(Swanson, Adam)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fannie Mae re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Admission Requirement, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Ct. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Swanson, Adam)
September 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk confirmed with Attorney Adam Swanson that he can be reached at the address listed in the Complaint and in CM/ECF. He holds an office at both addresses. Clerk emailed plaintiff's Attorney Scott T. Bielicki the documents pertaining to the case since he is not receiving service at this time due to the Notice of Attorney Admission Requirement. (kmp)
September 26, 2019 ***Answer due date set for Fannie Mae answer due 10/3/2019. (kmp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (kmp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Party Plaintiff; Attorney Scott T. Bielicki. Phone number is 315-813-3002. Admissions due by 10/9/2019. Copy served upon attorney by regular mail.(kmp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 2:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/6/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Fannie Mae. (kmp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Onondaga County Supreme Court, case number 007486/2019 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4883319) filed by Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poppenger v. Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Adam M. Swanson
Represented By: David S Mordkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Adam M. Swanson
Represented By: David S Mordkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Poppenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?