Kirby et al v. FIC Restaurants, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kareem Sullivan and Brittani Kirby
Defendant: FIC Restaurants, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01306
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/17/2019. (jdp, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/17/2019. (jdp, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 Supplemental Admission documents re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Warshaw, Aaron)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental Admission documents re: #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Warshaw, Aaron)
December 16, 2019 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James T. McBride. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
December 16, 2019 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan C. Wilson. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James T. McBridee Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4973603. filed by FIC Restaurants, Inc.. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Warshaw, Aaron)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan C. Wilson Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4973585. filed by FIC Restaurants, Inc.. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Warshaw, Aaron)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #7 is GRANTED. The time for defendant to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to January 24, 2020. Additionally, the In Person rule 16 conference as currently scheduled for 1/15/2020 is hereby re-scheduled for 2/26/2020 at 11:00 AM at the Federal Courthouse 15 Henry Street, Binghamton, New York before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Appearances by all counsel are required and the rule 16 conference is conducted In Person. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/19/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) So Ordered Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/22/2019.(jdp )
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Aaron Warshaw, Esq. for FIC Restaurants, Inc. requesting a sixty (60) day extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Warshaw, Aaron)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shabri Baliga on behalf of FIC Restaurants, Inc. (Baliga, Shabri)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Warshaw on behalf of FIC Restaurants, Inc. (Warshaw, Aaron)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kareem Sullivan, Brittani Kirby. FIC Restaurants, Inc. served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Murphy, James)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 1:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/8/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FIC Restaurants, Inc. (pjh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against FIC Restaurants, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4916235) filed by Kareem Sullivan and Brittani Kirby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby et al v. FIC Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem Sullivan
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: James E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittani Kirby
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: James E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIC Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Shabri Baliga
Represented By: Aaron Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?