J.J.R. Properties of New York, LLC v. Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London et al
Plaintiff: J.J.R. Properties of New York, LLC
Defendant: International Insurance Company of Hanover SE, DTW 1991, Catlin Via Chesterfield XLC 2003, Liberty Syndicate Lib 4472 Via Pioneer Underwriting, Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London, Antares Aul 1274, GEP II, LLC, Lloyds Syndicates and XYZ Insurance Entity
Case Number: 5:2019cv01370
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed status report regarding response to complaint by various defendants and letter motion for extension (Dkt. No. #8 ), which is granted. Plaintiff shall file a further status report by 1/15/2020 regarding any communications with defendants presently in default. Plaintiff should be more mindful of court deadlines in the future. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 12/19/2019. (sg)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER Request/STATUS REPORT TO JUDGE DANCKS by J.J.R. Properties of New York, LLC. (Lynn, Martin) Modified on 12/18/2019 (sg, ).
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Peiper on behalf of Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London (Peiper, Steven)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the #5 Stipulation requesting extension of the answer deadline for defendant Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London, which is approved and granted. Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London answer deadline extended to 1/9/2020. Counsel are reminded that requests for extensions of deadlines must be made before the relevant deadline passes and must include a good cause reason for the extension. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a status report by 12/16/2019 on any communications Plaintiff has had with the other defendants in this case and whether Plaintiff intends to request Clerk's entry of default as to those defendants. It is further ORDERED that attorney Peiper must file a notice of appearance to continue making electronic filings in this case. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this text order upon attorney Peiper. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 12/12/2019. (sg )
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, extending time to Answer, move or otherwise respond by Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London. (Peiper, Steven)
November 25, 2019 ***Answer deadline set for Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London; Antares Aul 1274; Catlin Via Chesterfield XLC 2003; DTW 1991; GEP II, LLC; International Insurance Company of Hanover SE; Liberty Syndicate Lib 4472 Via Pioneer Underwriting; Lloyds Syndicates; and XYZ Insurance Entity to 12/9/2019. (jmb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and General Order 25 served on All Defendants on November 18, 2019, filed by J.J.R. Properties of New York, LLC. (Lynn, Martin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/28/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for Antares Aul 1274, #2 Summons issued for Catlin, #3 Summons issued for DTW 1991, #4 Summons issued for Liberty Syndicate Lib 4472, #5 Summons issued for International Insurance Company of Hanover SE, #6 Summons issued for GEP, II, LLC, #7 Summons issued for Lloyds Syndicates, #8 Summons issued for XYZ Insurance Entity)(jmb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: against Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London, Antares Aul 1274, Catlin Via Chesterfield XLC 2003, DTW 1991, Liberty Syndicate Lib 4472 Via Pioneer Underwriting, International Insurance Company of Hanover SE, GEP II, LLC, Lloyds Syndicates and XYZ Insurance Entity (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4932030) filed by J.J.R. Properties of New York, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Loss, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) {Attorney advised the Court that Madison County is the county for assignment} (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.J.R. Properties of New York, LLC v. Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Insurance Company of Hanover SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTW 1991
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin Via Chesterfield XLC 2003
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Syndicate Lib 4472 Via Pioneer Underwriting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters of Lloyds of London
Represented By: Steven E. Peiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antares Aul 1274
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEP II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Syndicates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J.R. Properties of New York, LLC
Represented By: Martin A. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?