International Union of Painters & Allied Trades, District Council No. 4 et al v. Hosek Contractors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hogan, Daniel Jackson, Earl R. Hall, Dominic Zirilli, John Lignos, Jim Stathopoulous, Jeffrey Sturtz, Michael Dems, Christine Inluxay, Bernard Clement, Aaron Hilger, Allen Richards, International Union of Painters & Allied Trades, District Council No. 4, Daniel LaFrance, Martha Gomez, Scott Verrall, Tony Mariano, Paul Scouras, Todd Rotunno, Frank A. Vetrone, Joseph Knarr and Brian Lipczynski
Defendant: Francis L. Hosek and Hosek Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01406
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: As a result of Plaintiffs filing of Motion for Default Judgment #8 , the Court hereby adjourns and orders STAYED without date the In Person rule 16 initial conference currently scheduled for 2/19/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/6/2020.(jdp )
January 6, 2020 MOTION SCHEDULING NOTICE as to #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hosek Contractors, Inc. and Francis L. Hosek . Response to Motion due by 1/28/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/3/2020. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2020 ON SUBMIT before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. (bjw, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hosek Contractors, Inc. and Francis L. Hosek filed by Bernard Clement, Michael Dems, Martha Gomez, Earl R. Hall, Aaron Hilger, Michael Hogan, Christine Inluxay, International Union of Painters & Allied Trades, District Council No. 4, Daniel Jackson, Joseph Knarr, Daniel LaFrance, John Lignos, Brian Lipczynski, Tony Mariano, Allen Richards, Todd Rotunno, Paul Scouras, Jim Stathopoulous, Jeffrey Sturtz, Scott Verrall, Frank A. Vetrone, Dominic Zirilli. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph Guza, #2 Exhibit(s) A to Guza Affidavit, #3 Exhibit(s) B to Guza Affidavit, #4 Exhibit(s) C to Guza Affidavit, #5 Exhibit(s) D to Guza Affidavit, #6 Affidavit of Susan Bernat, #7 Exhibit(s) A to Bernat Affidavit, #8 Exhibit(s) B to Bernat Affidavit, #9 Exhibit(s) C to Bernat Affidavit, #10 Exhibit(s) D to Bernat Affidavit, #11 Proposed Order/Judgment, #12 Certificate of Service) (Guza, Joseph)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE BY COURT TO COUNSEL re #7 Clerk's Entry of Default. A motion for Default Judgment shall be filed within 30 days from Clerk's Entry of Default. (bjw, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Francis L. Hosek and Hosek Contractors, Inc. approving the #6 Request for Entry of Default (pjh)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Defendants by John Lignos, Joseph Knarr, Daniel Jackson, Scott Verrall, Daniel LaFrance, Tony Mariano, International Union of Painters & Allied Trades, District Council No. 4, Christine Inluxay, Earl R. Hall, Brian Lipczynski, Dominic Zirilli, Todd Rotunno, Jim Stathopoulous, Frank A. Vetrone, Paul Scouras, Michael Dems, Martha Gomez, Bernard Clement, Jeffrey Sturtz, Allen Richards, Aaron Hilger, Michael Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Entry of Default, #3 Certificate of Service)(Guza, Joseph)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Lignos, Joseph Knarr, Daniel Jackson, Scott Verrall, Daniel LaFrance, Tony Mariano, International Union of Painters & Allied Trades, District Council No. 4, Christine Inluxay, Earl R. Hall, Brian Lipczynski, Dominic Zirilli, Todd Rotunno, Jim Stathopoulous, Frank A. Vetrone, Paul Scouras, Michael Dems, Martha Gomez, Bernard Clement, Jeffrey Sturtz, Allen Richards, Aaron Hilger, Michael Hogan. Francis L. Hosek served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Guza, Joseph)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John Lignos, Joseph Knarr, Daniel Jackson, Scott Verrall, Daniel LaFrance, Tony Mariano, International Union of Painters & Allied Trades, District Council No. 4, Christine Inluxay, Earl R. Hall, Brian Lipczynski, Dominic Zirilli, Todd Rotunno, Jim Stathopoulous, Frank A. Vetrone, Paul Scouras, Michael Dems, Martha Gomez, Bernard Clement, Jeffrey Sturtz, Allen Richards, Aaron Hilger, Michael Hogan. Hosek Contractors, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Guza, Joseph)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 1:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/12/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hosek Contractors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Francis Hosek)(pjh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Francis L. Hosek and Hosek Contractors, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4942961) filed by International Union of Painters & Allied Trades, District Council No. 4, Scott Verrall, Tony Mariano, Paul Scouras, Jeffrey Sturtz, Todd Rotunno, Aaron Hilger, Daniel Jackson, John Lignos, Christine Inluxay, Earl R. Hall, Brian Lipczynski, Jim Stathopoulous, Frank A. Vetrone, Martha Gomez Bernard Clement, Daniel LaFrance, Joseph Knarr, Dominic Zirilli, Michael Dems, Allen Richards and Michael Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Painters & Allied Trades, District Council No. 4 et al v. Hosek Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hogan
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jackson
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl R. Hall
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Zirilli
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lignos
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Stathopoulous
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Sturtz
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dems
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Inluxay
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Clement
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Hilger
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Richards
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters & Allied Trades, District Council No. 4
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel LaFrance
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Gomez
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Verrall
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Mariano
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Scouras
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Rotunno
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank A. Vetrone
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Knarr
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lipczynski
Represented By: Joseph L. Guza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis L. Hosek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hosek Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?