Mulcahy v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Plaintiff: Todd M. Mulcahy
Defendant: Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Johnson Controls, Inc. and Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv01410
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Johnson Controls, Inc. (jdp)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk replaced #8 Amended Complaint with a signed copy. (jdp )
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: granting #9 Letter Request. The time for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to 1/13/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/30/2019. (nmk)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Thomas A. Linthorst for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company requesting that the Court grant BMS a two-week extension of time to respond to the Amended Complaint submitted to Judge David N. Hurd . (Linthorst, Thomas)
December 15, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Todd M. Mulcahy.(LaPlante, Robert) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/2/2020) (jdp, ).
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re #4 G.O. 25 Filing Order, Proof of Service of Filing Order by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Linthorst, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: granting #5 Letter Request. The time for defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 12/17/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/21/2019. (nmk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Thomas Linthorst for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint submitted to Judge David N. Hurd . (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)(Linthorst, Thomas)
November 15, 2019 ***Answer deadline set for Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company to 11/21/2019. (jmb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/6/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: filed by Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company. No Parent Corporation exists. (jmb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT: relating to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company. (jmb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: from NYS Supreme Court, County of Oswego, case number EFC-2019-1233 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4943565) filed by Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Complaint and Waiver of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulcahy v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company
Represented By: Rudolph J Burshnic, II
Represented By: Thomas A. Linthorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Rudolph J Burshnic, II
Represented By: Thomas A. Linthorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd M. Mulcahy
Represented By: Robert L. LaPlante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?