Gaffey et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Gaffey and James Gaffey
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 5:2019cv01470
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred electronically to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2738. (plp)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 JMPDL Conditional Transfer Order #191. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2738 Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Freda L. Wolfson, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
January 6, 2020 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:20-cv-00184, filed 01/06/2020. (plp)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS: filed by John H. Beisner, Esq., (Not currently admitted in the NDNY) on behalf of Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., advising the Court that the #1 Complaint in this action is contained within the schedule of related actions being considered for inclusion by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/18/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE: sent to Johnson & Johnson on 11/25/2019 by Brian A. Goldstein, Esq., on behalf of Kathleen A. Gaffey and James Gaffey. (Attachments: #1 Waiver for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.)(jmb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: against Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4955133) filed by Kathleen A. Gaffey and James Gaffey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaffey et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Gaffey
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gaffey
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?