Crossgates Mall General Company Newco, LLC v. LM Wireless, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Crossgates Mall General Company Newco, LLC
Defendant: LM Wireless, LLC and Jason Feinstein
Case Number: 5:2019cv01587
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Counsel are directed to submit a status report, on or before 3/6/2020, providing an update on settlement discussions. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/3/2020. (nmk)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: This case is hereby removed from the ADR Program. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/3/2020. (nmk)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for the joinder of parties and the amendment of pleadings is 3/16/2020. Discovery cutoff is 5/15/2020. Substantive motions to be filed by 6/1/2020. Signed by U..Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/3/2020. (nmk)
January 31, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Rule 16 conference held on 1/31/2020 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: The court explained the Mandatory Mediation Program to counsel and removed the case from the program. Counsel are directed to conduct discovery to determine the citizenship of the LLC parties to confirm diversity jurisdiction. Outstanding mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged by 2/10/2020. Pretrial deadlines were established. A scheduling order will be issued on behalf of District Judge Scullin. Counsel are directed to submit a status report, on or before 3/6/2020, providing an update on settlement discussions. Appearances: J. Michael Naughton, Esq. for plaintiff; Martha Berry, Esq. and Joshua Jacobs, Esq. for defendants. Time: 11:29 AM - 11:34 AM; 11:40 AM - 11:45 AM. (nmk)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Crossgates Mall General Company Newco, LLC. (Naughton, J.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: granting #5 Letter Request. The joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/24/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 Conference is RESCHEDULED to 1/31/2020 at 11:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 1/8/2020. (nmk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 Letter Motion from J. Michael Naughton, Esq. for Crossgates Mall General Company Newco, LLC requesting Request to Reschedule Conference submitted to Judge Hon. Andrew T. Baxter . (Naughton, J.)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Jason Feinstein, LM Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A: Email exchange)(Berry, Martha)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/16/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Jason Feinstein and LM Wireless, LLC. (dpk)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Onondaga, case number 010867-2019 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4980161) filed by LM Wireless, LLC and Jason Feinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 State Court Records, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)
December 20, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Jason Feinstein answer due 12/27/2019; LM Wireless, LLC answer due 12/27/2019. (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crossgates Mall General Company Newco, LLC v. LM Wireless, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Martha L. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Feinstein
Represented By: Martha L. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crossgates Mall General Company Newco, LLC
Represented By: J. Michael Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?