UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Cortes-Lamb et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Teresa J. Cortes-Lamb, XYZ Corporation, Teresa Cortes-Lamb, JOHN DOE, MARY ROE and Credit Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv00066
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed status report (Dkt. No. #7 ) and motion to amend (Dkt. No. #8 ) which does not comport with FRCP 15 or Local Rule 7.1(a)(4), therefore the motion is denied without prejudice. Court will permit Plaintiff to resubmit the motion with an updated proposed amended complaint that properly identifies the proposed parties to be substituted for the Doe defendants in the caption and within the proposed amended complaint, along with proposed summonses for the newly identified defendants. Plaintiff is required to be familiar with the Local Rules and should consult them before submitting any motions.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/26/2020. (sg )
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2020 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks Response to Motion due by 3/16/2020 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order to Amend, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Malone, Cynthia)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Malone, Cynthia)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the docket and finds that the time for defendants Teresa Cortes-Lamb and Credit Acceptance Corp. to answer the complaint has expired. No appearance has been made on behalf of either defendant nor has any request been made for extension of time. Plaintiff to file status report by 2/26/2020 advising the Court on any communications Plaintiff has had with defendants Cortes-Lamb and Credit Acceptance Corp., and whether Plaintiff intends to file Request for Clerk's Entry of Default as to defendants Cortes-Lamb and Credit Acceptance Corp. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/19/2020. (sg)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Teresa J. Cortes-Lamb served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020; Credit Acceptance Corporation served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Malone, Cynthia)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (LaBletta, Nicole)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (pjh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Teresa J. Cortes-Lamb. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Credit Acceptance Corporation)(pjh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teresa J. Cortes-Lamb, Credit Acceptance Corporation, JOHN DOE, MARY ROE and XYZ Corporation filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)
January 17, 2020 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, Mary Roe and XYZ Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on the "John Doe" defendants at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identities of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summonses will be issued at that time. (pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Cortes-Lamb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa J. Cortes-Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Cortes-Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY ROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Nicole B. LaBletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?