Capozza et al v. The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Plaintiff: Richard R. Capozza and Ann M. Capozza
Defendant: The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Case Number: 5:2020cv00406
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 TEXT NOTICE of Telephone Status Conference: A Telephone Status Conference has been set for 8/25/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to coordinate the call with defendant's counsel and contact the Court on its conference line at (315) 234-8618 once all counsel are on the line for the call.(sg )
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation: Deadline for Mediator Selection is 6/12/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 5/15/2020. (sg )
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Responses to Rule 33 and 34 Requests due 5/29/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 9/8/2020. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/23/2020. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 11/9/2020. Discovery due by 12/7/2020. Discovery Motions due 12/14/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 1/19/2021. Anticipated length of trial: 3 days. Preferred Trial Location: Binghamton NY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 5/15/2020. (sg )
May 12, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/12/2020. Appearances: Martin Lynn, Esq. for Plaintiffs; Meg Reid, Esq. for Defendant. Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures completed. Parties have served Rule 33 and 34 Requests. Court reviews Civil Case Management Plan. Court encourages parties to hold depositions by video or other means given the circumstances arising from the COVID-19 pandemic to keep discovery moving forward. After learning from counsel that one of the plaintiffs is a local attorney, Judge Dancks noted for the parties that plaintiff was in her law school class, but that she does not have any other community or social connections with him. The parties should file any request for Judge Dancks to recuse herself by 5/29/2020. Case referred into Mandatory Mediation. Pretrial deadlines are established, a scheduling order and mediation referral order will be issued. (sg )
May 7, 2020 TEXT NOTICE RE: 5/12/2020 11:00am Telephone Rule 16 Conference: Counsel are directed to call the following number at the time of the call: 1-888-684-8852, Access Code 7855922, Security Code 85762. Please follow the prompts/instructions when making this call. (sg )
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Richard R. Capozza. (Lynn, Martin)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut.(Reid, Meg)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed docket and notes that Defendant's answer was due 4/13/2020. To date, the answer has not been filed nor has a request for extension of time been filed with the Court. Court sua sponte extends time for defendant to file answer: The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut answer due 4/23/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/16/2020. (sg )
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Richard R. Capozza. (Lynn, Martin)
April 7, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut answer due 4/13/2020 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(2)(C). (jel, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 11:00 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/5/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut. (jel, ) Modified on 4/7/2020 (jel, ).
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Onondaga County Supreme Court, case number 001160/2020 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5081414) filed by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capozza et al v. The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard R. Capozza
Represented By: Martin A. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann M. Capozza
Represented By: Martin A. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?