Henessey Food Consulting LLC v. Prinova Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Henessey Food Consulting LLC
Defendant: Prinova Solutions, LLC and Prinova US LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00806
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2020 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prinova Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nagase Holdings America Corp., Other Affiliate Nagase & Co., Ltd. for Prinova Solutions, LLC.. (Lackowitz, David)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER approving the #7 Stipulation and granting request for extension of time for Defendant to file answer. Counsel are reminded that requests for extensions must be made before the relevant deadline passes and be supported by a good cause basis for the extension. Prinova Solutions, LLC answer due 9/14/2020. The 10/15/2020 Rule 16 Conference will proceed as scheduled. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/13/2020. (sg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint extending time for Defendants to move or otherwise respond by Prinova Solutions, LLC submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (Lackowitz, David)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Lackowitz on behalf of All Defendants (Lackowitz, David)
August 4, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Prinova Solutions, LLC answer due 8/13/2020. (khr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, Order served on Prinova Solutions, LLC., f/k/a Prinova US LLC on 7-23-20, filed by Henessey Food Consulting LLC. (Muldoon, James)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Henessey Food Consulting LLC. (Muldoon, James)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/8/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Prinova Solutions, LLC. (jel, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prinova Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5175760) filed by Henessey Food Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, ) Modified on 7/17/2020 (jel, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henessey Food Consulting LLC v. Prinova Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinova Solutions, LLC
Represented By: David A. Lackowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinova US LLC
Represented By: David A. Lackowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henessey Food Consulting LLC
Represented By: James R. Muldoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?