Chen v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Xu Chen
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00938
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER approving #14 Stipulation and granting request for extension of time for defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC to respond to the Complaint. Counsel are reminded that requests for extensions must be made before the relevant deadline expires and must be supported by a good cause reason for the extension. Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC Answer due 8/28/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/21/2020. (sg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Computershare Limited for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Vignocchi, Clayton)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC submitted to Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr.. (Vignocchi, Clayton)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Clayton Vignocchi on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Vignocchi, Clayton)
August 21, 2020 IMPORTANT TEXT NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: the Rule 16 Initial Conference: The 10/7/2020 R. 16 Conference has been RESCHEDULED before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. All of Magistrate Judge Dancks' conferences are BY TELEPHONE unless otherwise advised by the Court. The Telephone Rule 16 Initial Conference has been RESCHEDULED for 10/21/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed NO LATER THAN 10/14/2020 and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/14/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Counsel are directed to call the following number for this conference: 1-877-336-1829, Access Code 8029754, Security Code 4475. (sg)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER approving #10 Stipulation and granting request for extension of time for defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC to respond to the Complaint. Counsel are reminded that requests for extensions of deadlines must be made before the relevant deadline passes and must be supported by a good cause reason for the request. Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 9/21/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/20/2020. (sg)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER approving #7 Stipulation and granting request for extension of time for Defendant State Farm to respond to the Complaint. Counsel are reminded that requests for extensions of deadlines must be made before the relevant deadline passes and be supported by a good cause reason for the request. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company answer due 8/28/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/20/2020. (sg )
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #2 State Court Complaint Extension of Time To Respond by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Jeanfreau, Charles)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #4 Notice of Admission Requirement,, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, (Lagios, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Jeanfreau, Jr on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Jeanfreau, Charles)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #2 State Court Complaint, Set/Reset Answer Deadline by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company submitted to Judge Therese W. Dancks. (Lagios, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey W. Shannon on behalf of Xu Chen (Shannon, Kelsey)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/19/2020. (pjh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC; Attorney Charles H. Jeanfreau, Email address is Charles.Jeanfreau@mccalla.com. Phone number is 732-902-5397, as to Party Defendant, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Attorney Carter Burgess, Email address is Carter.Burgess@hklaw.com. Phone number is 904-798-5458 Admissions due by 9/1/2020. [A copy of this Notice, together with a courtesy copy of the Dkt. No. #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order Issued were emailed to both attorneys on 8/18/2020](hmr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 01:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/30/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
August 18, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Notice of Removal: Clerk replaced attachment 4 to this docket entry with the correct document, since another document was filed in error in the original filing. (hmr)
August 18, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 8/21/2020; Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 8/21/2020; State Farm Fire and Casualty Company answer due 8/21/2020. (hmr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (hmr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Onondaga County Supreme Court, case number 004209/2020 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5206328) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email Consent from Nationstar dated 8/10/2020, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email Consent from Specialized Loan Servicing dated 8/14/2020, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/18/2020) (hmr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Clayton Vignocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Charles H. Jeanfreau, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael A Troisi
Represented By: James P. Lagios
Represented By: Mark J. Wagner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xu Chen
Represented By: Kelsey W. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?