Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC et al v. Adecco USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Nationial Insurance Company and Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01018
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, State Nationial Insurance Company (Barrett, Andrew)
September 24, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Adecco USA, Inc. The answer due date is being set for 10/8/2020 in light of defense counsel's representation that service via email was accepted and counsel agreed to the extended deadline. (pjh, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Barrett on behalf of Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, State Nationial Insurance Company (Barrett, Andrew)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Adecco Inc. on 9/3/2020, filed by Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, State Nationial Insurance Company. (Barrett, Andrew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrew E. Barrett is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC and State Nationial Insurance Company. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/18/2020. (nmk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew E. Barrett Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5238246. filed by Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, State Nationial Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit(s) E-filing Form, #4 Exhibit(s) Petition Form, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Admission Order) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Friedberg, Barry)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Attorney Andrew Barrett, Email address is abarrett@dt-law.com. Phone number is 248-979-9814. Admissions due by 9/15/2020. {Notice sent to attorney via email}(pjh, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/24/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adecco USA, Inc. (pjh, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Adecco USA, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5225387) filed by Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC and State National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Staffing Services Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC et al v. Adecco USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Nationial Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry J. Friedberg
Represented By: Andrew E. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC
Represented By: Barry J. Friedberg
Represented By: Andrew E. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?