Tall Tines Holdings LLC et al v. Administrator of General Services for the United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Shane Adams and Tall Tines Holdings LLC
Defendant: Lamb Chop Knoll LLC, Administrator of General Services for the United States of America and Ed Daly
Case Number: 5:2020cv01139
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: granting #11 Letter Request. The time for Administrator of General Services for the United States of America to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 1/25/2021. A joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/2/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 Conference is reset for 2/9/2021 at 11:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 3362194 to connect to the conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/6/2020. (nmk)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 Letter Motion from Carl G. Eurenius for Administrator of General Services for the United States of America requesting an extension of time submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Eurenius, Carl)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tall Tines Holdings LLC, Shane Adams. Lamb Chop Knoll LLC waiver sent on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Pelligra, John)
October 1, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Administrator of General Services for the United States of America answer due 11/24/2020. (mgh)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on United States Attorney for NDNY (on behalf of Defendant Administrator of General Services for the United States) on September 25, 2020, filed by Shane Adams, Tall Tines Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for United States Attorney General, #2 Affidavit of Service for Administrator of General Services for the United States (Agency itself))(Pelligra, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Administrator of General Services (GSA Building- Washington D.C.) for the United States of America. (mgh)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Shane Adams, Tall Tines Holdings LLC is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Pelligra, John)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to - U.S. Attorney General-Administrator of General Services for the United States of America. (mgh)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Pelligra on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pelligra, John)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Shane Adams, Tall Tines Holdings LLC is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Pelligra, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/21/2020 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/14/2020. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Administrator of General Services for the United States of America, Ed Daly, Lamb Chop Knoll LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Lamb Chop Knoll LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Ed Daly)(mgh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administrator of General Services for the United States of America, Ed Daly, Lamb Chop Knoll LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5247788) filed by Tall Tines Holdings LLC, Shane Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Declaration of Elise Klysa in support of complaint)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tall Tines Holdings LLC et al v. Administrator of General Services for the United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Adams
Represented By: David G. Burch, Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Pelligra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tall Tines Holdings LLC
Represented By: David G. Burch, Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Pelligra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamb Chop Knoll LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator of General Services for the United States of America
Represented By: Carl G. Eurenius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?